Denton v. Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Alice Denton
Defendant: Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv01237
Filed: August 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Jamal N Whitehead
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 10/22/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 11/5/2024, Joint Status Report due by 11/12/2024. Signed by Judge Jamal N Whitehead. (GC)
August 28, 2024 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #9 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter: Deficiency Notice STRICKEN by Clerk. Jury demand has already been properly indicated, see dkt #1 -3 Verification of State Court Records and 4 Letter from Clerk. (MJV)
August 27, 2024 Filing 9 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #8 Answer to Complaint. ***Action Required*** Jury Demand Improperly Indicated.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (KRA) Modified to STRIKE Deficiency on 8/28/2024. Jury demand has already been properly indicated, see dkt #1 -3 Verification of State Court Records and #4 Letter from Clerk (MJV).
August 26, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint; by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Blackburn, Joanne)
August 20, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Natalia Smirnova on behalf of Defendant Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Smirnova, Natalia)
August 19, 2024 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge Jamal N Whitehead for all further proceedings. Hon. Brian A Tsuchida no longer assigned to case. (AQ)
August 19, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 8/26/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AQ)
August 19, 2024 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. JURY DEMAND - properly submitted state court jury demand on file for plaintiff. (RE)
August 19, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s).See attached letter for more information and instructions. (RE)
August 19, 2024 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (RE)
August 13, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Farmers Insurance Exchange, Corporate Parent Fire Insurance Exchange, Corporate Parent Truck Insurance Exchange for Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Blackburn, Joanne)
August 13, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 24-2-14661-0; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8584479) filed by Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: # (1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Decl of Joanne T. Blackburn iso Def's Notice of Removal, #3 Verification of State Court Records)(Blackburn, Joanne) Modified on 8/19/2024 to edit duplicative document title. (RE) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/19/2024: #4 Complaint) (RE).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Denton v. Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alice Denton
Represented By: Robert Dean Bohm
Represented By: Christopher Michael Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foremost Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Joanne Thomas Blackburn
Represented By: Natalia Smirnova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?