Athena AG Inc. v. Advanced Nutrients US LLC
Plaintiff: Athena AG Inc
Defendant: Advanced Nutrients US LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv01239
Filed: August 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. § 1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Jury Trial is set for 10/14/2025 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Length of Trial: *4 days*. Joinder of Parties due by 12/13/2024, Amended Pleadings due by 12/13/2024, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/17/2025, Motions due by 5/19/2025, Discovery completed by 6/16/2025, Dispositive motions due by 7/16/2025, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 9/2/2025, Motions in Limine due by 9/16/2025, Pretrial Order due by 10/2/2025, Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/9/2025, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/9/2025. The court will not provide remote public access for this hearing. (LC)
October 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 27 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 4. Filed by Plaintiff Athena AG Inc.(Lansverk, Eric)
September 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 26 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Athena AG Inc, TO RESPONSE to #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6)(Lansverk, Eric)
September 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #24 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney John Gary Maynard, III for PLAINTIFF Athena AG Inc, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(MG)
September 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #24 by attorney John Gary Maynard, III will not be processed at this time. The Pro Hac attorney must submit a Pro Hac Vice access request via #Manage My Account on PACER, under the Maintenance tab. See page 2 of the #Pro Hac Vice Application Guide for detailed instructions. Please contact Admissions Clerk Monique Guillebeau at 206-370-8433 or #WAWD_Admissions@wawd.uscourts.gov with additional questions. (MG)
September 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 24 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY John Gary Maynard, III FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Athena AG Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8631275 (Lansverk, Eric)
September 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DECLARATION of Isaiah Taylor filed by Defendant Advanced Nutrients US LLC re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Wang, Theresa)
September 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECLARATION of Theresa H. Wang filed by Defendant Advanced Nutrients US LLC re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Wang, Theresa)
September 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE, by Defendant Advanced Nutrients US LLC, to #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Wang, Theresa)
September 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Filed by Plaintiff Athena AG Inc. Noting Date 9/24/2024, (Lansverk, Eric)
September 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Advanced Nutrients US LLC.(Gonzalez, Justo)
September 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Advanced Nutrients US LLC. (Wang, Theresa)
August 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Attorney Justo G Gonzalez added for Advanced Nutrients US LLC per Defendant's #17 Notice of Appearance. (SB)
August 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Theresa Wang on behalf of Defendant Advanced Nutrients US LLC. (Wang, Theresa)
August 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 9/18/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/25/2024, Joint Status Report due by 10/2/2024. (LC)
August 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Athena AG Inc re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #13 Declaration, (Lansverk, Eric)
August 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Advanced Nutrients US LLC on 8/19/2024, filed by Plaintiff Athena AG Inc. (Lansverk, Eric)
August 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of Robert Schneider filed by Plaintiff Athena AG Inc re #12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Lansverk, Eric)
August 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff Athena AG Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 9/24/2024 9/17/2024, (Lansverk, Eric) Modified noting date on 9/11/2024 (SB).
August 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Advanced Nutrients US LLC. (SB)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS re #3 Request by Plaintiff Athena AG Inc (Lansverk, Eric)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #3 Request. ***Action Required*** Summons Form Incomplete.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (CDA)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Athena AG Inc. (Lansverk, Eric)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Eric David Lansverk on behalf of Plaintiff Athena AG Inc. (Lansverk, Eric)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (MG)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DISREGARD, filed in error Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required***See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MG) Modified on 8/15/2024 strike, filed in error (CDA).
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #5 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter : Disregard, filed in error. (CDA)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 8/22/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(MG)
August 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Judge Ricardo S. Martinez added. (MG)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of AO 120 Report ; filed by Plaintiff Athena AG, Inc.. (Wu, Alexander)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST for Summons by Plaintiff Athena AG, Inc. (Wu, Alexander)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET; filed by Plaintiff Athena AG, Inc.. (Wu, Alexander)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-8585028) Attorney Alexander M. Wu added to party Athena AG, Inc.(pty:pla) filed by Athena AG, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint)(Wu, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Athena AG Inc. v. Advanced Nutrients US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Advanced Nutrients US LLC
Represented By: Theresa Wang
Represented By: Justo G Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Athena AG Inc
Represented By: Alexander M. Wu
Represented By: Eric David Lansverk
Represented By: John Gary Maynard, III
Represented By: John Gary Maynard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?