GS Holistic LLC v. Kahn et al
Plaintiff: GS Holistic LLC
Defendant: Abdul R Khan and Supernova NW LLC doing business as Xhale Vapor & Smoke
Case Number: 2:2024cv01290
Filed: August 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Abdul R Khan mailed on 9/17/2024 (Harris, Brett)
October 15, 2024 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Supernova NW LLC mailed on 9/17/2024 (Harris, Brett)
October 10, 2024 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Supernova NW LLC on 8/29/2024, filed by Plaintiff GS Holistic LLC. (Harris, Brett)
August 22, 2024 Filing 5 Summons Electronically Issued as to all Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(MIH)
August 22, 2024 Filing 4 Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Jury Demand Improperly Indicated.See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MIH)
August 22, 2024 Filing 3 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action. Emailed to the US Patent Office (MIH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2024: #1 Complaint and re-generated notice to the Patent Office) (CDA).
August 22, 2024 Judge James L. Robart added. (MIH)
August 19, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by GS Holistic, LLC. (Harris, Brett)
August 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Abdul R Khan, Supernova NW LLC with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-8592210) Attorney Brett C Harris added to party GS Holistic, LLC(pty:pla) filed by GS Holistic, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Report on Patents and Trademarks (AO Form 120), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Harris, Brett) (Attachment 1 replaced on 8/22/2024) to replace malformed PDF (MIH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GS Holistic LLC v. Kahn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abdul R Khan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Supernova NW LLC doing business as Xhale Vapor & Smoke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GS Holistic LLC
Represented By: Brett C Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?