Langendoerfer v. Williamson
Plaintiff: Robert Langendoerfer
Defendant: Linda Williamson
Case Number: 2:2024cv01328
Filed: August 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Referring Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2024 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Linda Williamson mailed on 9/16/2024 9/17/2024 (Delderfield, Adam) Modified mailed on date to match document and regenerated NEF on 10/7/2024 (CJS).
October 4, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Adam W. Delderfield on behalf of Defendant Linda Williamson. (Delderfield, Adam)
September 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. Served by First-Class Mail on 9/17/24 to Linda Williamson. (MIH)(cc: Plaintiff with Pro Se Instruction sheet; Snohomish County Prosecutor's Office via USPS)
September 16, 2024 Filing 6 1983 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Robert Langendoerfer against Defendant Linda Williamson with JURY DEMAND.(MIH)
September 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan (cc: Plaintiff and Snohomish County Corrections Finance Department via USPS, WAWD Finance), (MIH)
September 5, 2024 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge S. Kate Vaughan filed by Robert Langendoerfer. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement)(MIH)
September 5, 2024 IFP deficiency corrected (MIH)
August 23, 2024 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge S. Kate Vaughan. ***Action Required*** Incorrect IFP Form.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 9/23/2024 to correct IFP application (cc: Letter and IFP form to Plaintiff via USPS) (CR)
August 23, 2024 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (CR)
August 21, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Robert Langendoerfer before Judge S. Kate Vaughan (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, #2 Prison Trust Account Statement) Modified on 8/23/2024 motion terminated due to incorrect IFP form (CR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langendoerfer v. Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Williamson
Represented By: Adam W. Delderfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Langendoerfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?