Hearne v. The Home Depot
Plaintiff: Kyle Hearne
Defendant: The Home Depot
Case Number: 2:2024cv01475
Filed: September 12, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 2, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2024 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Court-Appointed Counsel, filed by Plaintiff Kyle Hearne. Noted by clerk for 10/14/2024. (SB)
September 16, 2024 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) The Home Depot (IFP Granted) filed by Kyle Hearne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (SB)
September 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan. (SB) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
September 16, 2024 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (CR)
September 12, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Kyle Hearne before Judge S. Kate Vaughan (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 EEOC Right to Sue Letter, #4 Email Filing of Case) (CR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hearne v. The Home Depot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Hearne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Home Depot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?