The Travelers Indemnity Company v. McKinstry Co LLC et al
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Defendant: Urban Visions MFA Second & Pike LLC, Sellen Construction Co Inc and McKinstry Co LLC
Case Number: 2:2024cv01718
Filed: October 21, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: S Kate Vaughan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 2201 Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Hon. S. Kate Vaughan, re: parties' #21 Stipulated Motion; McKinstry Co LLC and Sellen Construction Co Inc answers are due 1/20/2025. (TF)
December 11, 2024 Filing 21 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Deadlines for McKinstry and Sellen to Answer Complaint, filed by Plaintiff The Travelers Indemnity Company, Defendants McKinstry Co LLC, Sellen Construction Co Inc. Noting Date 12/11/2024, (Laboda, Nicholas)
December 10, 2024 Filing 20 REPLY, filed by Defendant McKinstry Co LLC, TO RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Stay (Davis, Charles)
December 9, 2024 Filing 19 Supplemental DECLARATION of Greg D. Pendleton filed by Defendant Sellen Construction Co Inc re #13 MOTION to Stay (Pendleton, Greg)
December 9, 2024 Filing 18 REPLY, filed by Defendant Sellen Construction Co Inc, TO RESPONSE to #13 MOTION to Stay (Pendleton, Greg)
December 4, 2024 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Mark Croom re #15 Response to Motion by Plaintiff The Travelers Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Lether, Thomas)
December 4, 2024 Filing 16 DECLARATION of N. Chance Laboda re #15 Response to Motion by Plaintiff The Travelers Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Lether, Thomas)
December 4, 2024 Filing 15 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff The Travelers Indemnity Company, to #11 MOTION to Stay , #13 MOTION to Stay . (Lether, Thomas)
November 19, 2024 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Greg D. Pendleton filed by Defendant Sellen Construction Co Inc re #13 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Pendleton, Greg)
November 19, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay , filed by Defendant Sellen Construction Co Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/10/2024, (Pendleton, Greg)
November 19, 2024 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Todd Hayes filed by Defendant McKinstry Co LLC re #11 MOTION to Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Davis, Charles)
November 19, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Stay , filed by Defendant McKinstry Co LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/10/2024, (Davis, Charles)
November 13, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate McKinstry Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate McKinstry Partners, LLC for McKinstry Co LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by McKinstry Co LLC. (Hayes, Todd)
November 12, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Todd Christopher Hayes on behalf of Defendant McKinstry Co LLC. (Hayes, Todd)
October 30, 2024 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Sellen Construction Co Inc. (Pendleton, Greg)
October 30, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Katherine S Wan on behalf of Defendant Sellen Construction Co Inc. (Wan, Katherine)
October 30, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Greg D Pendleton on behalf of Defendant Sellen Construction Co Inc. (Pendleton, Greg)
October 29, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for The Travelers Indemnity Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Lether, Thomas)
October 28, 2024 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Sellen Construction Co Inc mailed on 10/22/2024 (Lether, Thomas)
October 23, 2024 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant McKinstry Co LLC mailed on 10/22/2024 (Lether, Thomas)
October 23, 2024 Filing 2 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Summons to Sellen, #2 Summons to Urban Vision)(HH)
October 23, 2024 Hon. S. Kate Vaughan added. (HH)
October 23, 2024 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff(s) The Travelers Indemnity Company must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/30/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(HH)
October 21, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against defendant(s) by The Travelers Indemnity Company (Receipt # AWAWDC-8681774) Attorney Thomas Lether added to party The Travelers Indemnity Company(pty:pla) filed by The Travelers Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Lether, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Travelers Indemnity Company v. McKinstry Co LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Nicholas Chance Laboda
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Urban Visions MFA Second & Pike LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sellen Construction Co Inc
Represented By: Katherine S Wan
Represented By: Greg D Pendleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinstry Co LLC
Represented By: Todd Christopher Hayes
Represented By: Charles K Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?