Hearne v. Lake Forest Park Municipal Court et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Hearne
Defendant: Lake Forest Park Municipal Court and King County
Case Number: 2:2024cv01754
Filed: October 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2024 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. After careful consideration of Plaintiff's IFP application, the governing law, and the balance of the record, the Court recommends that Plaintiff's IFP application (dkt. #1 ) be DENIED and Plaintiff be directed to pay the filing fee. Objections to this Report and Recommendation, if any, should be filed with the Clerk and served upon all parties to this suit not later than fourteen (14) days from the date on which this Report and Recommendation is signed. Responses to objections may be filed by the day before the noting date. If no timely objections are filed, the matter will be ready for consideration by the District Judge on 12/6/2024. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (KRA) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
October 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause by 11/12/2024, why the Court should not recommend his IFP application be denied. In the alternative, Plaintiff may file a corrected IFP application by that date. The Clerk is directed to renote consideration of Plaintiffs IFP application (dkt. #1 ) for 11/12/2024. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (KRA) (cc: Replaced Dkt. 4 sent to Plaintiff via USPS) (Main Document 4 replaced on 10/28/2024) (KRA). Modified to include re-note information and re corrected document mail-out on 10/28/2024 (KRA).
October 28, 2024 Noting Date Set/Reset re #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L. Peterson: Noted for 11/12/2024, per Dkt. #4 Order. (KRA) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
October 26, 2024 Filing 3 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. cc plaintiff via US Mail(CDA)
October 16, 2024 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L. Peterson filed by Kyle Hearne. (Attachments: #1 PROPOSED Complaint, #2 PROPOSED Compliant (blank and unsigned), #3 PROPOSED Motion for Court Appointed Counsel, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Email transmittal)(CDA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hearne v. Lake Forest Park Municipal Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lake Forest Park Municipal Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Hearne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?