Belmonte v. City of Seattle et al
Plaintiff: David L Belmonte and Dameas Shiruk Duranzan
Defendant: Doe 2, City of Seattle and Doe 1
Case Number: 2:2024cv01760
Filed: October 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2024 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Proposed 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. Plaintiff has not paid the filing fee or filed an application to proceed IFP. Plaintiff has not responded to the Clerks letter nor taken any action in this case since he initiated the case. Therefore, the Court recommends this case be dismissed without prejudice. Objections to this Report and Recommendation, if any, should be filed with the Clerk and served upon all parties to this suit not later than fourteen (14) days from the date on which this Report and Recommendation is signed. Responses to objections may be filed by the day before the noting date. If no timely objections are filed, the matter will be ready for consideration by the District Judge on 1/2/2025. Signed by Judge David W. Christel. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Judgment)(CJS)(cc:Plaintiff via USPS)
October 30, 2024 Filing 2 Notice of Filing Deficiency re #1 Proposed Document(s). ***Action Required*** 1983 Filing Fee Not Paid, Prison Trust Account Statement.See attached letter for more information and instructions. Filer has until 11/29/2024 to correct IFP application (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (CR)
October 23, 2024 Filing 1 PROPOSED 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint (NO IFP/NO FILING FEE) filed by Plaintiff David L Belmonte aka Dameas Shiruk Duranzan (CR) Modified on 11/1/2024 add name of plaintiff (Belmonte) per King County Jail Roster (CDA).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belmonte v. City of Seattle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L Belmonte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dameas Shiruk Duranzan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe 1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?