Bitar v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Brittany Bitar
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Case Number: 2:2024cv01802
Filed: November 1, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Josef Theodore Reibel. Filed by Plaintiff Brittany Bitar. (Reibel, Josef)
November 14, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Roberto Duarte White on behalf of Defendant Allstate Indemnity Company. (White, Roberto)
November 14, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Lucy Wilhelm for Defendant Allstate Indemnity Company. (Wilhelm, Lucy)
November 12, 2024 Filing 8 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Brittany Bitar (Reibel, Josef)
November 12, 2024 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. In addition to the requirements articulated in FRCP 26(f)(3), the Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Kadya Peter at kadya_peter@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 12/24/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 12/31/2024, Joint Status Report due by 1/7/2025. (KMP)
November 12, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (KMP)
November 12, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) re: #1 Notice of Removal by Allstate Indemnity Company.(Case, Bryan)
November 4, 2024 Filing 4 LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from Snohomish County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. Ad Hoc: Attorney Josef Theodore Reibel due to contact information does not match with ECF record. (HH)
November 4, 2024 U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour added. (HH)
November 1, 2024 Filing 3 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Allstate Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Case, Bryan)
November 1, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Other Affiliate Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for Allstate Indemnity Company. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Case, Bryan)
November 1, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Snohomish County Superior Court, case number 24-2-08109-31; (Receipt # AWAWDC-8701089) filed by Allstate Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Case, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bitar v. Allstate Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Bitar
Represented By: Josef Theodore Reibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Indemnity Company
Represented By: Sarah Demaree Macklin
Represented By: Bryan J. Case
Represented By: Roberto Duarte White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?