Brookfield Condominium Association v. Country Casualty Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Brookfield Condominium Association
Defendant: Country Casualty Insurance Company and Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Case Number: 2:2024cv01876
Filed: November 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tana Lin
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2024 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER (text only) made at the direction of Judge Tana Lin: The Court has posted Chambers Procedures at #https://www.wawd.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-procedures. All counsel and unrepresented ("pro se") parties are DIRECTED to review them, if they have not already done so. Failure to follow the requirements set forth in the Chambers Procedures may result in the imposition of sanctions. (KMP)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. 455 AND CANON 3 OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES by Judge Tana Lin. (KMP)
November 19, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE AND DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1) and (2). Filed by Brookfield Condominium Association. (Stein, Daniel)
November 15, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Country Casualty Insurance Company (HH)
November 15, 2024 Judge Tana Lin added. (HH)
November 15, 2024 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1), Plaintiff Brookfield Condominium Association must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/22/2024. If applicable, a Diversity Disclosure Statement may be required pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(2). In order to properly notify the Court, use the event Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement located in CM/ECF under Other Filings, Other Documents.(HH)
November 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-8718946) filed by Brookfield Condominium Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Stein, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brookfield Condominium Association v. Country Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Country Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Insurance Companies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brookfield Condominium Association
Represented By: Justin D Sudweeks
Represented By: Jerry H. Stein
Represented By: Daniel Stein
Represented By: Cortney Feniello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?