Nguyen v. Mercer Island Boys Basketball Booster Club
Plaintiff: Elle Nguyen
Defendant: Mercer Island Boys Basketball Booster Club
Case Number: 2:2024cv01990
Filed: December 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Robert S Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DECLARATION of Rebecca Robinson filed by Defendant Mercer Island Boys Basketball Booster Club re #11 MOTION for Protective Order (Ashbaugh, Denise)
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 DECLARATION of Karen Friedman filed by Defendant Mercer Island Boys Basketball Booster Club re #11 MOTION for Protective Order (Ashbaugh, Denise)
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 DECLARATION of Kelly Coochise filed by Defendant Mercer Island Boys Basketball Booster Club re #11 MOTION for Protective Order (Ashbaugh, Denise)
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of Denise L. Ashbaugh filed by Defendant Mercer Island Boys Basketball Booster Club re #11 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A - E)(Ashbaugh, Denise)
January 29, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION for Protective Order , filed by Defendant Mercer Island Boys Basketball Booster Club. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/12/2025, (Ashbaugh, Denise)
January 16, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying Plaintiff's #9 Motion for Discovery. Plaintiffs' request that unidentified discovery requests be deemed admitted is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MJV)
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Discovery , filed by All Parties. (Nguyen, Elle)
December 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Lisa Michelle Herb for Defendant Mercer Island Boys Basketball Booster Club from December 16, 2024 to December 30, 2024. (Herb, Lisa)
December 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE: Plaintiff Elle Nguyen has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (KB)
December 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Mercer Island Boys Basketball Booster Club. (Ashbaugh, Denise) Modified on 12/10/2024 - NEF regenerated to plaintiff (KB).
December 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint to Defamation Claim in Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Mercer Island Boys Basketball Booster Club.(Ashbaugh, Denise) Modified on 12/10/2024 - NEF regenerated to plaintiff (KB).
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Unavailability of counsel Denise L Ashbaugh for Defendant Mercer Island Boys Basketball Booster Club from December 16, 2024 to January 2, 2025. (Ashbaugh, Denise) Modified on 12/10/2024 - NEF regenerated to plaintiff (KB).
December 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES. Length of Trial: To be determined. Jury Trial is set for 7/7/2025 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 15106 before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Discovery completed by 3/9/2025, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 3/23/2025, Dispositive motions due by 4/8/2025, Motions in Limine due by 6/9/2025, Pretrial Order due by 6/25/2025, Trial briefs and trial exhibits to be submitted by 7/2/2025, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 7/2/2025. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (cc: Plaintiff via US Mail) NEF regenerated on 12/6/2024 (VE) Modified on 12/6/2024 (VE)
December 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Mercer Island Boys Basketball Booster Club, filed by Elle Nguyen.(MJV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nguyen v. Mercer Island Boys Basketball Booster Club
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elle Nguyen
Represented By: Elle Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercer Island Boys Basketball Booster Club
Represented By: Lisa Michelle Herb
Represented By: Denise L Ashbaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?