Genail v. Holland American Line NV
Plaintiff: RACHEL GENAIL
Defendant: Holland American Line NV
Case Number: 2:2024cv02039
Filed: December 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2025 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. Case reassigned to Judge John H. Chun for all further proceedings. (TF)
February 6, 2025 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 2/13/2025. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
February 6, 2025 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with JURY DEMAND by Holland American Line NV. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nield, Edgar)
February 6, 2025 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Carnival Corporation & plc for Holland American Line NV. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by Holland American Line NV. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nield, Edgar)
February 6, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Edgar Roy Nield on behalf of Defendant Holland American Line NV. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Nield, Edgar)
February 6, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman on behalf of Defendant Holland American Line NV. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
December 19, 2024 Filing 3 SERVICE OF SUMMONS and Complaint returned executed upon defendant Holland American Line NV on 12/19/2024 (Hunt, Ryan)
December 12, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Electronically Issued as to defendant Holland American Line NV (HH)
December 12, 2024 Hon. Michelle L. Peterson added. (HH)
December 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) HOLLAND AMERICA LINE N.V. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-8754635) Attorney Ryan J Hunt added to party RACHEL GENAIL(pty:pla) filed by RACHEL GENAIL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Hunt, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genail v. Holland American Line NV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RACHEL GENAIL
Represented By: Ryan J Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holland American Line NV
Represented By: Jeffrey B Maltzman
Represented By: Edgar Roy Nield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?