Garkov et al v. The Pentagon et al
Plaintiff: Georgi Blazhev Garkov
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency, The Pentagon and Jehovah Witnesses
Case Number: 2:2025cv00090
Filed: January 13, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
Presiding Judge: John H Chun
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2025 Filing 7 NOTICE: Plaintiff Georgi Blazhev Garkov has registered to receive electronic service. The party WILL NOT be e-filing. (LH)
March 5, 2025 Filing 6 COMPLAINT filed by Georgi Blazhev Garkov against defendant(s) Central Intelligence Agency, Jehovah Witnesses, The Pentagon. (IFP Granted) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Email Transmittal) (MJV)
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Plaintiff's #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)(MJV)
March 3, 2025 Filing 4 RESPONSE TO #3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Georgi Blazhev Garkov. (MJV)
January 15, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause by 2/19/2025, why this Court should not recommend his IFP application be denied. Alternatively, Plaintiff may submit an amended IFP application by that date, explaining his circumstances more fully. The Clerk is directed to re-note Plaintiff's #1 IFP application for 2/20/2025 and to send copies of this order to Plaintiff and to the Honorable John H. Chun. Signed by Hon. Michelle L. Peterson. (cc: Plaintiff via USPS) (MJV)
January 15, 2025 Filing 2 LETTER to Filer re case number and Judge assignment. cc Plaintiff via email and USPS. (HH)
January 13, 2025 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis before Judge Michelle L. Peterson, filed by Georgi Blazhev Garkov. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Unsigned Financial Affidavit, #4 Supporting Documents, #5 Email Transmittal)(HH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garkov et al v. The Pentagon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgi Blazhev Garkov
Represented By: Georgi Blazhev Garkov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Intelligence Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Pentagon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jehovah Witnesses
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?