Spencer et al v. King County
Plaintiff: Raymond Spencer, Lael Spencer and Waverly Hills Club Incorporated
Defendant: King County
Counter-Claimant: King County
Counter-Defendant: Waverly Hills Club Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2025cv00204
Filed: January 31, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of Washington
Presiding Judge: Tiffany M Cartwright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE to Withdraw Motion filed in Closed Case ; filed by Consol Plaintiff Waverly Hills Club Incorporated. (Klinge, Charles)
March 19, 2025 Filing 9 AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by Consol Plaintiff Waverly Hills Club Incorporated., COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Waverly Hills Club Incorporated (Harris, Emily)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Consolidating Cases. 2:25-cv-00204-TMC Spencer et al v. King County and 3:25-cv-05137-TMC Waverly Hills Club Incorporated v. King County are CONSOLIDATED for discovery and pretrial motions. The Court will consider whether to consolidate for trial at a later point. All future filings in this consolidated action must be filed under case number 2:25-cv-00204-TMC, with the following caption: Spencer et al v. King County, 2:25-cv-00204-TMC. Signed by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. (MW)
March 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER. The "Motion to Transfer Case to Seattle Division" #5 is DENIED as moot. As reflected by the case number, this case remains a Seattle division case. All judges in this District may hear civil cases from the Seattle or Tacoma divisions. See General Order 03-25, "Division of Court Business." Pretrial hearings will take place in the Tacoma courthouse in the courtroom of the assigned judge unless good cause is shown for a Zoom hearing or a hearing in the Seattle courthouse. If there are any claims that will be tried to a jury, a jury trial will occur in the Seattle courthouse with a jury drawn from the Seattle division. Authorized by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. (MW)
March 12, 2025 Attorneys Kristin E Bateman and Elisa J Wood added for King County; per #4 Notice of Appearance. (MW)
March 11, 2025 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Kristin E. Bateman filed by Defendant King County re #5 MOTION to Transfer Case to Seattle Division (Harris, Emily)
March 11, 2025 Filing 5 MOTION to Transfer Case to Seattle Division, filed by Defendant King County. Noting Date 4/8/2025, (Harris, Emily)
March 11, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Emily J Harris on behalf of Defendant King County. (Harris, Emily)
February 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT, DISCOVERY, DEPOSITIONS AND EARLY SETTLEMENT by District Judge Tiffany M. Cartwright. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/15/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/22/2025, Joint Status Report due by 5/29/2025. (MET)
February 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER. The following minute order is made by the direction of the court, the Honorable James L. Robart: This case is hereby transferred to the Honorable Tiffany M. Cartwright as related to Waverly Hills Club Inc. v. King Cnty., No. C25-5137-TMC. All future documents filed in this case must bear case numbers ending in "TMC." Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (TE)
February 4, 2025 Judge James L. Robart added. (AVC)
January 31, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Lael Spencer King County (Receipt # AWAWDC-8822614) Attorney Richard M Stephens added to party Raymond Spencer(pty:pla), Attorney Richard M Stephens added to party Lael Spencer(pty:pla) filed by Raymond Spencer, Lael Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephens, Richard) Modified on 1/31/2025 to update party filing is against (KB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer et al v. King County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Spencer
Represented By: Richard M Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lael Spencer
Represented By: Richard M Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waverly Hills Club Incorporated
Represented By: Richard M Stephens
Represented By: Charles A Klinge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King County
Represented By: Kristin E Bateman
Represented By: Emily J Harris
Represented By: Elisa J Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: King County
Represented By: Kristin E Bateman
Represented By: Emily J Harris
Represented By: Elisa J Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Waverly Hills Club Incorporated
Represented By: Richard M Stephens
Represented By: Charles A Klinge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?