IN RE: Richard Roy Scott
Case Number: 3:2005mc05029
Filed: September 15, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER denying 173 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez.(CDA)cc Richard Scott via US Mail
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying 168 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. Pursuant to the bar order above, Plaintiff is not entitled to IFP status to prosecute his claims. If he wishes to proceed, he must pay the required filing fee for his complaint.(CDA)cc plaintiff via US Mail
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 157 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis, signed by Chief Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (GMR- cc: pltf via USPS w/ 158 Minute Order)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall open a new civil case, Richard Roy Scott v Mark Strong, and shall file in that docket both the original complaint (Dkt. No. 142-1) and the amended complaint (Dkt. No. 150) which Mr. Scott filed upon receipt of the Ninth Circuit's Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Scott's request to be permitted to proceed in forma pauperis in the above mention matter is GRANTED 142 . Signed by Chief Judge Marsha J. Pechman.(CMG)(cc to Plaintiff) Modified on 1/13/2016 (CMG).
December 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this order to pay the $350 filing fee. (Copy sent to Plaintiff) (JS)
July 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER that the above captioned matter 122 have not been previously litigated by plainitff and may proceed subject to the other requirements imposed by the "Order Adopting Report and Recommendation," dated 4/5/2005. The Clerk of Court shall docket this order in MC05-5029 and open a new cause of action containing all documents related to plaintiff's 5/9/11 submission (Dkt. 122, 124, 125, and the filing fee.) Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff via mail)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER that the action submited 4/21/11 119 shall not be permitted to proceed. Neither the Clerk of Court nor defendant need take any further action with regards to this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff Scott)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: Richard Roy Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?