Witt v. Department of the Air Force et al Featured Case
Plaintiff: Margaret Witt
Defendant: Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne and Mary L Walker
Case Number: 3:2006cv05195
Filed: April 12, 2006
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2012. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 176 Motion for Bill of Costs in the amount of $ 14,956.25 against Defendants by Joe Whiteley.(JW)
November 26, 2010 Filing 182 APPEAL NOTIFICATION packet sent to US Court of Appeals re 180 Notice of Appeal, (Attachments: # 1 docket report)(MW)
November 23, 2010 NO appeal fees: appellant USA-fee waived, re 180 Notice of Appeal, filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne, Mary L Walker, Department of the Air Force (MW)
November 23, 2010 Filing 181 Civil Appeals Docketing Statement by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Mary L Walker, Michael W Wynne, to be transmitted by Clerk to Circuit Court of Appeals. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit)(Phipps, Peter)
November 23, 2010 Filing 180 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 166 Judgment by Court, 163 Order, 70 Order on Motion for Protective Order, 164 Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Mary L Walker, Michael W Wynne. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Phipps, Peter)
October 27, 2010 Filing 179 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt, TO RESPONSE to 176 MOTION FOR BILL OF COSTS (Kung, Sher)
October 25, 2010 Filing 178 RESPONSE, by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Mary L Walker, Michael W Wynne, to 176 MOTION FOR BILL OF COSTS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Buckingham, Stephen)
October 14, 2010 Filing 177 DECLARATION of Sher Kung filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 176 MOTION FOR BILL OF COSTS (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-E)(Kung, Sher)
October 14, 2010 Filing 176 MOTION FOR BILL OF COSTS by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion for Costs) Noting Date 10/29/2010, (Kung, Sher)
October 12, 2010 Filing 175 PRAECIPE to redact names in docs 112-2 and 112-4 by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Kung, Sher)
October 12, 2010 Filing 174 PRAECIPE to redact names in docs 112-5 and 169-1 by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Kung, Sher)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 173 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Seal Previously Filed Documents 112-5 and 169-1. Approved by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Seal Previously Filed Documents 112-2 and 112-4 re dkt 112 Declaration filed by Margaret Witt. Approved by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
October 8, 2010 Filing 171 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to seal previously filed documents 112-2 and 112-4 by parties. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Dunne, Sarah)
October 8, 2010 Filing 170 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to seal previously filed documents 112-5 and 169-1 by parties. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Dunne, Sarah)
October 6, 2010 Filing 169 PRAECIPE re 112 Declaration,, Doc. No. 112-5 App G App H (redacted) by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix G-H pp. 132-172)(Lobsenz, James)
September 27, 2010 Filing 168 DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPT OF ANTHONY J. LOVERDE (Video played in lieu of live testimony) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(JAB)
September 27, 2010 Filing 167 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 161 Exhibit List. (List corrected to show that Exhibit 64 was admitted on 9/13) (Service of corrected image is attached). (JAB)
September 24, 2010 Filing 166 JUDGMENT BY COURT (JAB)
September 24, 2010 Filing 165 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Jean Boring; Pla Counsel: James Lobsenz, Sarah Dunne /Sher Kung; Def Counsel: Peter Phipps, Stephen Buckingham, Lt Col Todi Carnes; CR: Teri Hendrix; Bench Trial (Oral Ruling completed on 9/24/2010. Court reads Memorandum Opinion into record. Plaintiff should be reinstated subject to meeting applicable regulations touching upon qualifications necessary for continued service. Clerk to enter Judgment (JAB)
September 24, 2010 Filing 164 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAWby Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 MEMORANDUM OPINION by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
September 23, 2010 Filing 162 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re 157 Deposition,. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(JAB)
September 23, 2010 Filing 161 Exhibit List of Bench Trial (JAB) (Main Document 161 replaced on 9/27/2010) (JAB).
September 23, 2010 Filing 160 Witness List of Bench Trial (JAB)
September 23, 2010 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re [15 : Strike out language that Hrivnak testified by video dep. Testimony was live. (JAB)
September 21, 2010 Filing 158 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Jean Boring; Pla Counsel: James Lobsenz, Sarah Dunne /Sher Kung; Def Counsel: Peter Phipps, Bryan Diederich, Stephen Buckingham, Lt Col Todi Carnes; CR: Teri Hendrix; Bench Trial DAY 6 held on 9/21/2010. 9:30 Defense calls Lt Gen Charles E. Stenner, Jr, Chief Master Srgt Janice Kallinen; 11:00 Defense Rests: REBUTTAL: Plaintiff calls Maj Gen Dennis Laich; 2:10 Closing arguments presented; Court will issue its decision on Friday 9/24 @ 1:30 pm. Recess (JAB)
September 20, 2010 Filing 159 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Jean Boring; Pla Counsel: James Lobsenz, Sarah Dunne /Sher Kung; Def Counsel: Peter Phipps; CR: Teri Hendrix; Bench Trial DAY 5 held on 9/20/2010. 9:30 Plaintiff call Margaret Witt; Elizabeth Kier; Deposition of Elizabeth Kier PUBLISHED; Plaintiff rests; Recess 4:30 (JAB)
September 20, 2010 Filing 157 DEPOSITION for Perpetuation of Testimony of Thomas Hansen taken on August 27, 2010.(presented in lieu of live testimony by Plaintiff Margaret Witt.(JAB) Modified on 9/21/2010 (JAB). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2010: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5) (JAB).
September 17, 2010 Filing 156 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF TRIAL SUBPOENA upon Trooper Sleighter served on 9/15/10. (MET)
September 16, 2010 Filing 155 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Jean Boring; Pla Counsel: James Lobsenz, Sarah Dunne /Sher Kung; Def Counsel: Peter Phipps, Bryan Diederich, Stephen Buckingham, Lt Col Todi Carnes; CR: Teri Hendrix; Bench Trial DAY 4 held on 9/16/2010. 10:00 Plaintiff calls Nathaniel Frank; Edmond Hrivnak (by video deposition); Recess 4:30 (JAB) Modified on 9/23/2010 (Hrivnak testified live) (JAB).
September 15, 2010 Filing 154 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Jean Boring; Pla Counsel: James Lobsenz, Sarah Dunne, Sher Kung; Def Counsel: Peter Phipps, Bryan Diederich, Stephen Buckingham, Lt Col. Todi Carnes; CR: Teri Hendrix; Bench Trial DAY 3 held on 9/15/2010. 9:30 Plaintiff calls Jill Robinson, Heidi Smidt; Judy Krill; Faith Mueller; Anthony Loverde (video preservation deposition presented in open court); Recess 4:30 (JAB)
September 14, 2010 Filing 153 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Jean Boring; Pla Counsel: James Lobsenz, Sarah Dunne /Sher Kung; Def Counsel: Peter Phipps, Bryan Diederich, Stephen Buckingham, Lt Col Todi Carnes; CR: Teri Hendrix; Bench Trial DAY 2 held on 9/14/2010. 9:30 Darren Manzella resumes stand; Plaintiff calls Anthony Greenwald; Heather Julian; Stacey Lee Julian; Thomas Hansen (preservation deposition) read into record; Deposition of Anthony Greenwald PUBLISHED; Recess 4:30 (JAB)
September 13, 2010 Filing 152 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Jean Boring; Pla Counsel: James Lobsenz, Sarah Dunne, Sher Kung; Def Counsel: Peter Phipps, Bryan Diederich, Stephen Buckingham, Lt Col. Todi Carnes; CR: Teri Hendrix; Bench Trial Day 1 held on 9/13/2010. Opening Statements presented; Plaintiff calls James Schaffer; Jenny Kopfstein; Vince Oda; Darren Manzella; Recess 4:30 (JAB)
September 9, 2010 Filing 151 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Marion J. Mittet for Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Mary L Walker, Michael W Wynne. (Mittet, Marion)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER on defendant's challenge to the Court's jurisdiction to award monetary relief, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER re 144 Motion in Limine filed by Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne, Mary L Walker, Department of the Air Force; Exhs 63, 64 and 80 will be allowed. Secretary of Defense Robert Gates need not appear at trial. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
September 3, 2010 Filing 147 DECLARATION of Sarah Dunne re 146 Memorandum by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 1, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit A Part 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 1, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 2, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit B Part 3, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Dunne, Sarah)
September 3, 2010 Filing 146 MEMORANDUM Regarding Admissibility of Trial Exhibits 63, 64, and 80 by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. (Dunne, Sarah)
September 3, 2010 Filing 145 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re 141 Trial Brief ; filed by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Mary L Walker, Michael W Wynne. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Buckingham, Stephen)
September 3, 2010 Filing 144 MEMORANDUM in Support of Exclusion of Certain Exhibits by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Mary L Walker, Michael W Wynne. (Diederich, Bryan)
September 2, 2010 Filing 148 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Jean Boring; Pla Counsel: James Lobsenz, Sarah Dunne /Sher Kung; Def Counsel: Peter Phipps; CR: Teri Hendrix; Final Pretrial Conference held on 9/2/2010.. (JAB)
September 2, 2010 Filing 143 LIST re 137 List Revised Joint Witness and Exhibit List by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. (Dunne, Sarah)
August 31, 2010 Filing 142 Proposed Findings of Fact by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Mary L Walker, Michael W Wynne (Phipps, Peter)
August 31, 2010 Filing 141 TRIAL BRIEF by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Mary L Walker, Michael W Wynne. (Phipps, Peter)
August 31, 2010 Filing 140 TRIAL BRIEF of Plaintiff by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A-B pp 17-20)(Lobsenz, James)
August 31, 2010 Filing 139 Proposed Findings of Fact by Plaintiff Margaret Witt (Lobsenz, James)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER denying 134 Plaintiff's Motion in Limine, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
August 27, 2010 Filing 137 LIST Joint Witness and Exhibit List by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. (Dunne, Sarah)
August 23, 2010 Filing 136 RESPONSE, by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Mary L Walker, Michael W Wynne, to 134 MOTIONS IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Diederich, Bryan)
August 16, 2010 Filing 135 PRAECIPE re 134 MOTIONS IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. (Dunne, Sarah)
August 16, 2010 Filing 134 MOTIONS IN LIMINE TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/27/2010, (Dunne, Sarah)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying 102 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 118 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER denying 115 Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions Due to Spoliation of Evidence, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
August 9, 2010 Filing 131 RESPONSE, by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Mary L Walker, Michael W Wynne, to 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Motion. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Phipps, Peter)
August 9, 2010 Filing 130 DECLARATION of Margaret Witt filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B pp. 3-21)(Lobsenz, James)
August 9, 2010 Filing 129 Supplemental DECLARATION of James E. Lobsenz filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A-E pp. 5-38, # 2 Appendix F-J pp. 39-77)(Lobsenz, James)
August 9, 2010 Filing 128 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Margaret Witt, to 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Oral Argument Requested. (Lobsenz, James)
August 6, 2010 Filing 127 DECLARATION of Michelle McCluer filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 115 MOTION for Sanctions due to Spoliation of Evidence (Dunne, Sarah)
August 6, 2010 Filing 126 DECLARATION of Sarah Dunne filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 115 MOTION for Sanctions due to Spoliation of Evidence (Dunne, Sarah)
August 6, 2010 Filing 125 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt, TO RESPONSE to 115 MOTION for Sanctions due to Spoliation of Evidence (Dunne, Sarah)
August 2, 2010 Filing 124 RESPONSE, by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Mary L Walker, Michael W Wynne, to 115 MOTION for Sanctions due to Spoliation of Evidence. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Phipps, Peter)
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER DENYING re 122 Stipulation for Continuance of Remaining Pre-Trial and Trial dates, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
July 29, 2010 Filing 122 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Remaining Pretrial and Trial Dates by parties. (Phipps, Peter)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER on STIPULATION re 99 striking the 8/16/10 mediation deadline, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
July 23, 2010 Filing 120 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Motion. Filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. Noting Date 8/13/2010, (Lobsenz, James)
July 22, 2010 Filing 119 NOTICE of Administrative Record re 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; filed by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Mary L Walker, Michael W Wynne. (Attachments: # 1 Part 1, # 2 Part 2, # 3 Part 3, # 4 Part 4, # 5 Part 5, # 6 Part 6, # 7 Part 7, # 8 Part 8, # 9 Part 9, # 10 Part 10)(Phipps, Peter)
July 22, 2010 Filing 118 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Mary L Walker, Michael W Wynne. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/13/2010, (Phipps, Peter)
July 22, 2010 Filing 117 SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibits G-K of Sher Kung Declaration by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 114 Stipulation and Order (Dunne, Sarah)
July 22, 2010 Filing 116 DECLARATION of Sher Kung and Exhibits A-K filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 115 MOTION for Sanctions due to Spoliation of Evidence (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit L-BB)(Dunne, Sarah)
July 22, 2010 Filing 115 MOTION for Sanctions due to Spoliation of Evidence by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/6/2010, (Dunne, Sarah)
July 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER on STIPULATION re 100 GRANTING Stipulation to File Documents Marked "Confidential" Under Seal, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
July 22, 2010 Filing 113 NOTICE of Filing CD (Appendix N to James E. Lobsenz's Supplemental Declaration in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment) in Paper or Physical Form with the Clerk's Office by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. (Lobsenz, James)(CD sent to Chambers) Modified on 7/23/2010 (JAB).
July 22, 2010 Filing 112 Supplemental DECLARATION of James E. Lobsenz filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, B - Pages 5-33, # 2 Appendix C, D - Pages 34-58, # 3 Appendix E - Pages 59-82, # 4 Appendix F - Pages 83-131, # 5 Appendix G, H - Pages 132-172, # 6 Appendix I, J - Pages 173-203, # 7 Appendix K, L - Pages 204-223, # 8 Appendix M - Pages 224-256, # 9 Appendix M (Continued) - Pages 257-270, # 10 Appendix N - Page 271)(Lobsenz, James)
July 22, 2010 Filing 111 DECLARATION of Professor Anthony Greenwald filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Lobsenz, James)
July 22, 2010 Filing 110 Supplemental DECLARATION of Faith Mueller filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Motion (Lobsenz, James)
July 22, 2010 Filing 109 DECLARATION of David Poulsen filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Motion (Lobsenz, James)
July 22, 2010 Filing 108 DECLARATION of Pat Doe filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Motion (Lobsenz, James)
July 22, 2010 Filing 107 DECLARATION of Robin Chaurasiya filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A)(Lobsenz, James)
July 22, 2010 Filing 106 DECLARATION of Rod Boultinghouse filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Motion (Lobsenz, James)
July 22, 2010 Filing 105 DECLARATION of Heidi Smidt filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Motion (Lobsenz, James)
July 22, 2010 Filing 104 DECLARATION of Judith A. Krill filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Motion (Lobsenz, James)
July 22, 2010 Filing 103 DECLARATION of Lisa Chisa filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Motion (Lobsenz, James)
July 22, 2010 Filing 102 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support of Motion by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 8/6/2010, (Lobsenz, James)
July 21, 2010 Filing 101 DECLARATION of Sher Kung re 100 Stipulation by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. (Kung, Sher)
July 21, 2010 Filing 100 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER to file documents under seal by parties. (Kung, Sher)
July 21, 2010 Filing 99 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER regarding Settlement and Mediation by parties. (Dunne, Sarah)
July 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 98 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the request and agreement of Counsel, the following deadlines are reset. Dispositive motions due by 7/22/2010 and the Settlement conference to be held by 7/21/2010. s/Jean Boring as authorized by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 92 Motion to Amend Court's Order 91 , signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
June 18, 2010 Filing 96 REPLY, filed by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne, Mary L Walker, TO RESPONSE to 92 MOTION to Amend 87 Order on Motion for Protective Order, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Phipps, Peter)
June 15, 2010 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 95 Telephone Conference, Language corrected as follows: Conditional Discharge changed to "Conditions" Discharge (JAB)
June 14, 2010 Filing 95 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Jean Boring; Pla Counsel: James Lobsenz / Sarah Dunne; Def Counsel: Peter Phipps; CR: None; Telephone Conference held on 6/14/2010. Counsel brings concerns to the Court for discussion. 1) The status of Major Witt's discharge is unclear and that lack of clarity raises issues affecting the procedural due process claims. More time is requested for filing Summary Judgment motions (the current deadline is 6/15/2010); 2) The shifting political climate surrounding "Don't Ask, Don't Tell" begs the question of whether trial should be rescheduled to a later date. (currently the trial is scheduled for 9/13/2010); The Court declines to reset the trial date at this time. Counsel will further explore the meaning of "Conditional "Conditions Discharge" and the due date for Summary Judgment Motions is EXTENDED out 4 weeks per agreement of counsel to July 13, 2010. Dispositive motions due by 7/13/2010, (JAB) Modified on 6/15/2010 (JAB).
June 14, 2010 Filing 94 DECLARATION of Sarah Dunne filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 92 MOTION to Amend 87 Order on Motion for Protective Order, (Dunne, Sarah)
June 14, 2010 Filing 93 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Margaret Witt, to 92 MOTION to Amend 87 Order on Motion for Protective Order,. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Dunne, Sarah)
June 1, 2010 Filing 92 MOTION to Amend 87 Order on Motion for Protective Order,by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne, Mary L Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/18/2010, (Phipps, Peter)
June 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting 84 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
May 27, 2010 Filing 90 DECLARATION of Sher Kung filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 84 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Requests for Production No. 33 to 36 (Kung, Sher)
May 27, 2010 Filing 89 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt, TO RESPONSE to 84 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Requests for Production No. 33 to 36 (Kung, Sher)
May 24, 2010 Filing 88 RESPONSE, by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne, Mary L Walker, to 84 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Requests for Production No. 33 to 36. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Buckingham, Stephen)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 77 Plaintiff's Motion for Protective Order, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
May 14, 2010 Filing 86 PRAECIPE re 85 Declaration of Sher Kung re 84 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Requests for Production No. 33 to 36 by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. (Kung, Sher)
May 13, 2010 Filing 85 DECLARATION of Sher Kung filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 84 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Requests for Production No. 33 to 36 (Kung, Sher)
May 13, 2010 Filing 84 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Responsive to Requests for Production No. 33 to 36 by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/28/2010, (Kung, Sher)
May 7, 2010 Filing 83 DECLARATION of Sarah A. Dunne filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 77 MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting Interference with Non-Party Witnesses by Defendants (Dunne, Sarah)
May 7, 2010 Filing 82 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt, TO RESPONSE to 77 MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting Interference with Non-Party Witnesses by Defendants (Dunne, Sarah)
May 5, 2010 Filing 81 RESPONSE, by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne, Mary L Walker, to 77 MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting Interference with Non-Party Witnesses by Defendants. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration)(Diederich, Bryan)
April 28, 2010 Filing 80 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: 77 MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting Interference with Non-Party Witnesses by Defendants. Filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. Noting Date 5/7/2010, (Dunne, Sarah)
April 27, 2010 Filing 79 DECLARATION of Sher S. Kung filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 77 MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting Interference with Non-Party Witnesses by Defendants (Dunne, Sarah)
April 27, 2010 Filing 78 DECLARATION of Sarah A. Dunne filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 77 MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting Interference with Non-Party Witnesses by Defendants (Dunne, Sarah)
April 27, 2010 Filing 77 MOTION for Protective Order Prohibiting Interference with Non-Party Witnesses by Defendants by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/6/2010, (Dunne, Sarah)
April 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 75 Stipulated Motion Re Discovery Deadlines: Motions due by 5/17/2010, Discovery completed by 6/7/2010, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
April 16, 2010 Filing 75 Stipulated MOTION Stipulation and Order to Amend Deadlines in Minute Order re Discovery Dates by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. Noting Date 4/16/2010, (Dunne, Sarah)
April 2, 2010 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF DEPOSITION SUBPOENA upon Matt Schaffer served on 3/22/10. (CMG)
March 24, 2010 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Sher S Kung on behalf of Plaintiff Margaret Witt. (Kung, Sher)
March 22, 2010 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Bryan R. Diederich on behalf of Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne, Mary L Walker. (Diederich, Bryan)
March 16, 2010 Filing 71 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Stephen J. Buckingham on behalf of Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne, Mary L Walker. (Buckingham, Stephen)
March 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MINUTE ORDER denying 63 Motion for Protective Order. s/Jean Boring as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB)
March 12, 2010 Filing 69 REPLY, filed by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne, Mary L Walker, TO RESPONSE to 63 MOTION for Protective Order (Phipps, Peter)
March 9, 2010 Filing 68 DECLARATION of James E. Lobsenz filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 63 MOTION for Protective Order (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A-E pp. 11-38, # 2 Appendix F-G pp. 39-75)(Lobsenz, James)
March 9, 2010 Filing 67 DECLARATION of Edmond Hrivnak filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 63 MOTION for Protective Order (Lobsenz, James)
March 9, 2010 Filing 66 DECLARATION of Heather Julian filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 63 MOTION for Protective Order (Lobsenz, James)
March 9, 2010 Filing 65 DECLARATION of James Schaffer (Ret.) filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 63 MOTION for Protective Order (Lobsenz, James)
March 9, 2010 Filing 64 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Margaret Witt, to 63 MOTION for Protective Order. (Lobsenz, James)
March 4, 2010 Filing 63 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne, Mary L Walker. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit) Noting Date 3/12/2010, (Phipps, Peter)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MINUTE ORDER DENYING 61 Agreed MOTION to Amend 54 Minute Order Setting Trial, Pretrial Dates and Ordering Mediation. s/Jean Boring as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(JAB)
February 12, 2010 Filing 61 Agreed MOTION to Amend 54 Minute Order Setting Trial, Pretrial Dates and Ordering Mediation,,,,by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne, Mary L Walker. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/12/2010, (Phipps, Peter)
October 23, 2009 Filing 60 ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne, Mary L Walker.(Phipps, Peter)
September 14, 2009 Filing 59 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 54 Minute Order Setting Trial, Pretrial Dates and Ordering Mediation, addressed to Nicole D McCraw (JLP)Reason Attempted not known.
September 11, 2009 Filing 58 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 9/2/2009 before Judge Ronald B. Leighton.Parties have ten (10) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Information regarding the policy can be found on the court's website at www.wawd.uscourts.gov.To purchase a copy of the transcript contact court reporter Teri Hendrix by telephone at 253-882-3831. . Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2009, (PVO)
September 3, 2009 Filing 57 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 53 Notice of Hearing addressed to Nichole D. McCraw (Returned to sender/attempted, not known and unable to forward) (CMG)
September 2, 2009 Filing 56 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton- Dep Clerk: Jean Boring; Pla Counsel: James Lobsenz / Sarah Dunne; Def Counsel: Peter Phipps / Major Linell Letendre; CR: Teri Hendrix; Scheduling Conference held on 9/2/2009. Mr. Phipps outlines reasons for requesting bifurcated discovery. Court declines to bifurcate or limit discovery. Counsel discuss schedules. Trial Date is set for 9/13/2010. 6-7 Days are estimate. Clerk to issue scheduling order. (JAB)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL, PRETRIAL DATES AND ORDERING MEDIATION; Length of Trial: *6-7 DAYS*. Bench Trial is set for 9/13/2010 at 09:30 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Joinder of Parties due by 10/2/2009, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/17/2010, Motions due by 4/26/2010, Discovery completed by 5/17/2010, Dispositive motions due by 6/15/2010, Settlement conference to be held by 7/15/2010, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 8/16/2010, 39.1 Settlement Report due by 8/23/2010, Motions in Limine due by 8/16/2010, Pretrial Order due by 8/27/2010, Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2010 at 08:30 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. Trial briefs to be submitted by 8/31/2010, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 8/31/2010. s/Jean Boring by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
August 25, 2009 Filing 53 NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 9/2/2009 at 09:30 AM in B Courtroom before Judge Ronald B. Leighton. s/Jean Boring as directed by Judge Leighton.(JAB)
August 21, 2009 Filing 52 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. (Lobsenz, James)
August 5, 2009 Reset Deadlines: Per request of Dept. of Air Force, with plaintiff counsel's agreement, Joint Status Report is now due by 8/21/2009, (DN)
July 10, 2009 Reset Deadlines: Per counsels' request, Joint Status Report due by 8/7/2009, (DN)
June 17, 2009 Filing 51 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 49 Mandate of USCA addressed to Nichole D McCraw (MW)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER Requiring Joint Status Report be filed by 7/17/2009. s/Jean Boring as directed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB)
June 10, 2009 Filing 49 MANDATE of USCA as to 37 Notice of Appeal #06-35644 filed by Margaret Witt; judgment of this Court, entered 5/21/08, takes effect this date-AFFIRMED in part, REVERSED in part, and REMANDED (Attachments: # 1 opinion)(MW)
February 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER of the Supreme Court of the United States #08A729: application for an extension of time to file a petition for writ of certiorari has been granted-due by 4/3/09 in relation to 37 Notice of Appeal #06-35644, filed by Margaret Witt, (MW)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER of USCA as to 37 Notice of Appeal #06-35644 filed by Margaret Witt; panel voted to deny aples' petition for rehearing and deny aples' petition for rehearing En Banc (MW)
June 16, 2008 Filing 46 NOTICE of Appearance and Change of Address ; filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. (Dunne, Sarah)
November 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER of USCA as to 37 Notice of Appeal #06-35644 filed by Margaret Witt re supplementing the record (MW, )
January 16, 2007 CLERK'S RECORD ON APPEAL transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 37 Notice of Appeal, **ALL DOCUMENTS FILED ELECTRONICALLY & CAN BE VIEWED ON PACER** (MW, )
October 24, 2006 Filing 44 *Amended* CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re 37 Notice of Appeal #06-35644. Corrected Deft. name. (PVO, )
October 24, 2006 Filing 43 CERTIFICATE OF RECORD Transmitted to USCA re 37 Notice of Appeal #06-35644. (PVO, )
October 23, 2006 Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT of Hearing, held on 6/30/06, before Judge Ronald B. Leighton (re 37 Notice of Appeal #06-35644). Court Reporter: Julaine V. Ryen. (PVO, )
August 25, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER of USCA as to 37 Notice of Appeal #06-35644 filed by Margaret Witt; aplt's unopposed mtn to strike the briefing schedule is granted; court's 8/8/06 order is vacated as entered in error; this is not a preliminary injunction appeal; appeal shall proceed in the usual course; BRIEFING SCHEDULE: opening brief & excerpts of record due 10/2/06; answering brief due 11/1/06; optional reply brief due w/in 14 days (MW, )
August 11, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER of USCA as to 37 Notice of Appeal #06-35644 filed by Margaret Witt; appeal filed 7/31/06 is a preliminary injunction appeal; if they have not already done so, w/in 7 calendar days of the filing date of this order, parties shall make arrangements to obtain the official transcript; BRIEFING SCHEDULE: opening brief due by 8/28/06; answering brief due 9/25/06 or 28 days after svc of opening brief; opt reply due w/in 14 days; if aplt fails to file timely the opening brief, appeal will be dismissed automatically by the Clerk for failure to prosecute (MW, )
August 10, 2006 Filing 39 NOTICE by Plaintiff Margaret Witt of Request for Transcript Order (Lobsenz, James)
August 8, 2006 USCA Case Number 06-35644 for 37 Notice of Appeal filed by Margaret Witt,. (PVO, )
August 1, 2006 Filing 38 APPEAL NOTIFICATION packet sent to US Court of Appeals re 37 Notice of Appeal (Attachments: # 1 docket report)(MW, )
August 1, 2006 Appeal Fees received: fee in the amount of $ 455 (receipt # T-658) re 37 Notice of Appeal filed by Margaret Witt, (MW, )
July 31, 2006 Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEAL #06-35644 as to 36 Judgment by Court, 35 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. Filing Fee:. (Lobsenz, James) Modified on 8/8/2006-added appeal number (PVO, ).
July 27, 2006 Filing 36 JUDGMENT BY COURT (JAB, )
July 26, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER DENYING 8 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction; ORDER GRANTING 24 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss; and, ORDER finding as moot 31 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN, )
July 11, 2006 Filing 34 REPLY, filed by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne, Mary L Walker, TO RESPONSE to 31 MOTION to Stay Discovery and for Relief from the Deadlines Imposed by the Court's Minute Order of April 13, 2006 (Phipps, Peter)
July 6, 2006 Filing 33 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Margaret Witt, to 31 MOTION to Stay Discovery and for Relief from the Deadlines Imposed by the Court's Minute Order of April 13, 2006. (Lobsenz, James)
June 30, 2006 Filing 32 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Ronald B. Leighton - Dep Clerk: Jean Boring; Pla Counsel: James Lobsenz/ Aaron Caplan; Def Counsel: Peter Phipps/Jamie Mittet/Maj.Tracey Rockenbach; CR: Julaine Ryen; ORAL ARGUMENT on Prelimary Injunction and Motion to Dismiss held on 6/30/2006. Arguments presented. Court will issue a written decision. (JAB, )
June 28, 2006 Filing 31 MOTION to Stay Discovery and for Relief from the Deadlines Imposed by the Court's Minute Order of April 13, 2006 by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne, Mary L Walker. Noting Date 7/11/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Phipps, Peter)
June 26, 2006 Filing 30 NOTICE of Rescheduling the TIME of the Hearing: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 6/30/2006 at 02:00 PM in B Courtroom before Hon. Ronald B. Leighton. Time moved up from 3:00 pm. s/Jean Boring as authorized by Judge Leighton.(JAB, )
June 9, 2006 Filing 29 REPLY by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne, Mary L Walker to 24 MOTION AND RESPONSE. (Phipps, Peter) Modified on 6/12/2006: edited title of linked document #24 to reflect edited title (HBR).
June 5, 2006 Filing 28 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Margaret Witt, to 24 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion. (Lobsenz, James) Modified on 6/5/2006: Corrected link and text, per filer(HBR).
June 5, 2006 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 28 Response to Motion: added link to document 24 with text, per filer; edited out link to Oral Motion. (HBR)
May 23, 2006 Filing 27 NOTICE of Rescheduled Hearing: Preliminary/Permanent Injunction Hearing is RESET for 6/30/2006 at 03:00 PM in B Courtroom before Hon. Ronald B. Leighton. (JAB, )
May 15, 2006 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion: Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2006 at 10:00 AM in B Courtroom before Hon. Ronald B. Leighton. s/Jean Boring as directed by Judge Leighton.(JAB, )
May 12, 2006 Filing 25 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt, TO RESPONSE to 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion (Caplan, Aaron)
May 9, 2006 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re 24 Response to Motion, : Document filed as a response not a Motion and response (VB, )
May 8, 2006 Filing 24 RESPONSE MOTION AND RESPONSE , by Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne, Mary L Walker, to 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion. (Phipps, Peter) Modified on 6/9/2006 (VB,
May 8, 2006 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Marion J. Mittet on behalf of Defendants Department of the Air Force, Donald H Rumsfeld, Michael W Wynne, Mary L Walker (Mittet, Marion)
May 1, 2006 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 11 Declaration, 14 Declaration, 15 Declaration, 13 Declaration, 17 Declaration, 9 Declaration, 12 Declaration, 18 Declaration, 16 Declaration, 10 Affidavit, 20 Declaration,,, 19 Declaration, 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion. (Lobsenz, James)
May 1, 2006 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE of summons and complaint for declaratory and injunctive relief by Plaintiff Margaret Witt on April 12, 2006 (Lobsenz, James)
April 24, 2006 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Elizabeth Kier APPENDICES filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A p. 4-21# 2 Appendix A p. 22-39# 3 Appendix B p. 40-57# 4 Appendix C p. 58-92# 5 Appendix D p. 93-125# 6 Appendix D p. 126-149# 7 Appendix D p. 150-163# 8 Appendix E p. 164-171# 9 Appendix F p. 172-189# 10 Appendix F p. 190-204# 11 Appendix G p. 205-230# 12 Appendix G p. 231-256)(McCraw, Nichole)
April 24, 2006 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Professor Elizabeth Kier filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion (McCraw, Nichole)
April 24, 2006 Filing 18 DECLARATION of Major Vince Oda filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion (McCraw, Nichole)
April 24, 2006 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Major Annie Thomas filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion (McCraw, Nichole)
April 24, 2006 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Master Sergeant Jill Brinks filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion (McCraw, Nichole)
April 24, 2006 Filing 15 DECLARATION of Sharon Carlson filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion (McCraw, Nichole)
April 24, 2006 Filing 14 DECLARATION of Major Sue Schindler filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion (McCraw, Nichole)
April 24, 2006 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Julia Scott filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion (McCraw, Nichole)
April 24, 2006 Filing 12 DECLARATION of James Schaffer filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion (McCraw, Nichole)
April 24, 2006 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Stacey Jullian filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion (McCraw, Nichole)
April 24, 2006 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Major Faith M. Mueller filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion (McCraw, Nichole)
April 24, 2006 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Major Margaret Witt filed by Plaintiff Margaret Witt re 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion (McCraw, Nichole)
April 24, 2006 Filing 8 Oral MOTION for Preliminary Injunction And Memorandum In Support of Motion by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. Noting Date 5/12/2006.Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: # 1 Second half of Motion# 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McCraw, Nichole)
April 20, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 6 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Overlength Brief, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN, )
April 18, 2006 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to File An Overlength Brief by Plaintiff Margaret Witt. Noting Date 4/18/2006. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion For Leave To File An Overlength Brief)(McCraw, Nichole)
April 18, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This action has been reassigned to Judge Ronald B Leighton. All future documents filed in this case must bear the cause number C06-5195RBL and bear the Judge's name in the upper right hand corner of the document. Please make the necessary corrections to your records reflecting this change by Judge J. Kelley Arnold. (KAM, )
April 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 6/28/2006; Initial Disclosure Deadline is 7/5/2006; Joint Status Report due by 7/12/2006 by Judge J. Kelley Arnold. (KAM, )
April 13, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge J. Kelley Arnold. (KAM, )
April 13, 2006 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If consent, return the executed form by 5/12/2006. Please Note: Consents must not be electronically filed with the Court. (KAM, )
April 13, 2006 Joint Status Report NOTED on motion calendar; Noting Date 7/12/2006. (KAM, )
April 12, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all defendants (Summons(es) issued) (Receipt # T77) , filed by Margaret Witt. (Attachments: #(1) Appendix A - H #(2) Civil Cover Sheet)(KAM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witt v. Department of the Air Force et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Witt
Represented By: Aaron H Caplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of the Air Force
Represented By: Stephen J. Buckingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald H Rumsfeld
Represented By: Stephen J. Buckingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W Wynne
Represented By: Stephen J. Buckingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary L Walker
Represented By: Stephen J. Buckingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?