Macavilca v. McCluskey et al
Plaintiff: Domingo German Macavilca
Defendant: Alyssa McCluskey, Ben Maxwell, William Penaloza and A. Neil Clark
Case Number: 3:2008cv05263
Filed: April 25, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: J. Kelley Arnold
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT BY COURT in favor of A. Neil Clark, Alyssa McCluskey, Ben Maxwell, William Penaloza against Domingo German Macavilca (JLP)(copy mailed to plaintiff)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendation re 21 Report and Recommendation.Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff @ Kearny NJ address . Modified on 5/18/2009 (JL).
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 19 Order to Show Cause re 18 Order to Show Cause NOTED on motion calendar;. Noting Date 5/15/2009, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (JLP) (copy mailed to plaintiff)
March 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Plaintiff Response due by 4/3/2009, by Judge J. Kelley Arnold. (JLP)(Copy mailed to Plaintiff)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macavilca v. McCluskey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Domingo German Macavilca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alyssa McCluskey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Maxwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Penaloza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Neil Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?