Davis v. Astrue
Plaintiff: Brenda L. Davis
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Case Number: 3:2008cv05604
Filed: October 6, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: J. Kelley Arnold
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 JUDGMENT BY COURT ON ATTORNEY FEES in favor of Brenda L. Davis against Michael J Astrue (JLP)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION adopting Report and Recommendation re 14 Report and Recommendation. The Court adopts the Amended Report and Recommendation (Dkt. 14 ). The ALJ failed to properly assess plaintiff's fibromyalgia and the medical evidence. The matter is REMANDED to the administration for further proceeding in a manner consistent with the report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AMENDED REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Brenda L. Davis. : Noting Date 3/27/2009. The parties shall have ten days from service of this Report to file written objections by Judge J. Kelley Arnold. (JLP)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 1 Complaint filed by Brenda L. Davis. Noting Date 3/27/2009, by Judge J. Kelley Arnold. (JLP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Astrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda L. Davis
Represented By: Robert A. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Astrue
Represented By: Brian C Kipnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?