Stein v. Frakes
Petitioner: Jack K Stein
Respondent: Scott Frakes
Case Number: 3:2009cv05006
Filed: January 7, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER denying 192 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 4/15/2010 (DN). A copy of this Order was mailed to the petitioner by regular mail.
April 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 190 JUDGMENT BY COURT (MET)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER denying 170 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 2/4/2010 (DN). A copy of this Order was mailed to plaintiff by regular mail.
January 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER denying 162 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 1/8/2010 (DN). A copy of this Order was mailed to plaintiff by regular mail.
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER denying 136 Motion for immediate bail pending the outcome of the underlying petition for writ of habeas corpus; and denying 138 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; copy mailed to Petitioner)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER denying CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (re 127 Notice of Appeal ) (copy mailed to aplt Stein) (MW) Modified on 12/9/2009-add mailing note (MW).
November 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class/Certified Mail/Return Receipt Requested; mailed on 11/10/09 to Respondent & AG's office; General Order sent to Pltf. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; copy mailed to Petitioner)
October 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER granting 118 Motion for Reconsideration; granting 119 Motion for Leave to File 3rd Amended Habeas Petition, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 10/26/2009 (DN). A copy of this Order has been mailed to the plaintiff by regular mail.
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 115 JUDGMENT BY COURT (CMG; copy mailed to Petitioner)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 77 Amended Petition filed by Jack K Stein, 10 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jack K Stein. Noting Date 10/2/2009, by Judge J Richard Creatura. (JLP)(copy mailed to Pltf.)
June 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Peitioner will be provided one last opportunity to prepare, serve and file an amended petition by July 15, 2009 to cure deficiencies or court will recommend dismissal.by Judge J Richard Creatura. (JLP)(copy mailed to petitioner)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER striking 27 Motion for Summary Judgment; terminating 28 Motion for Order; denying 29 Motion for Order; granting 31 Motion for More Definite Statement by Judge J Richard Creatura.(JLP)(copy mailed to Plaintiff)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Jack K Stein. Motion terminated. by Judge J. Kelley Arnold.(JLP) (Copy mailed to Petitioner)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stein v. Frakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jack K Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Frakes
Represented By: Paul Douglas Weisser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?