Heagy v. Kitsap County et al
Plaintiff: Robert Dean Heagy
Defendant: Kitsap County, Boyer and Daniels
Case Number: 3:2009cv05091
Filed: February 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 JUDGMENT BY COURT (CMG; copy mailed to Plaintiff)
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (FRCP 12(c)) filed by Boyer, Kitsap County, Daniels. Noting Date 10/2/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; copy mailed to Plaintiff)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel by Judge J Richard Creatura.(JLP)(copy mailed to plaintiff)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Judge J. Kelley Arnold.(JLP)(Copy mailed to Plaintiff)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE on Defendants by US Marshals to Marshals on 3/18/09by Judge J. Kelley Arnold. (JLP) (Copy plus copy of General Order mailed to Plaintiff)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heagy v. Kitsap County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Dean Heagy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitsap County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?