Reed v. State of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Charles Vincent Reed
Defendant: State of Washington, Ron Van Boening, Kelly J Remy, Michael Hughes and Thomas Tangulleg
Case Number: 3:2010cv05146
Filed: March 4, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Presiding Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 JUDGMENT BY COURT (CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
August 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 60 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Charles Vincent Reed. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER that all discovery in this matter (including Plaintiff's 47 Motion to Compel) shall be STAYED pending further order of this court. Plaintiff's Motion to Deny Summary Judgment (ECF No. 44) and 53 Motion for Declaratory Judgment and Sanctions are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff) (Main Document 57 replaced on 6/16/2011) (CMG).
February 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(MET) cc: Plaintiff
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER directing defendants to file answer to the 24 Amended Complaint by 11/29/2010. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
June 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide service address for Defendant Tanguleg on or before 7/23/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff w/attachments)
June 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 9 Motion to Amend complaint. Plaintiff shall file his amended complaint, setting forth all of his factual claims, causes of action, claims for relief, and any exhibits, on or before 7/16/10. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
April 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by US Marshal; mailed on 4/15/10 to Defendants; General Order sent to Pltf. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reed v. State of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Vincent Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Van Boening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly J Remy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Tangulleg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?