Smith v. Wallace
Plaintiff: Kevin Joseph Smith
Defendant: Alexis T Wallace
Case Number: 3:2010cv05763
Filed: October 14, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Presiding Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 JUDGMENT BY COURT (CMG; cc to Plaintiff)
December 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 14 DISMISSING WITHOUT PREJUDICE prior to service for failure to state a claim, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 12/27/2010 (DN). (Copy mailed to plaintiff.)
November 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff shall file a response with the court on or before 12/3/2010, and shall indicate which version of his proposed amended complaint the court should review and indicate whether the prosecution of which he complains was terminated on the merits in his favor or were abandoned, signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (MET) cc: Plaintiff
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO AMEND COMPLAINT or SHOW CAUSE, by 11/19/2010, why this matter should not be dismissed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc w/attachments mailed to Plaintiff)
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(MET) cc: Plaintiff with general order and PLRA.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Joseph Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis T Wallace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?