McCarty et al v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Jerry R McCarty and Sheryl R McCarty
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 3:2011cv05078
Filed: January 27, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 57 Defendant U.S. Bank's Motion for Summary Judgment and for Final Judgment Quieting Title and Canceling Lis Pendens, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 6/12/2012 (DN). (cc to pltf Sheryl McCarty)
May 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 45 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; this matter is dismissed. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 5/16/2012 (DN). (cc to pltf Sheryl McCarty)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying 35 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend; denying 36 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 4/5/2012 (DN). (copy mailed to Sheryl McCarty)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying 14 Plaintiffs' Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss; signed by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(DN) Modified on 4/28/2011 (DN). (Copy mailed to Sheryl McCarty.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarty et al v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Marshall L Ferguson
Represented By: John Alan Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry R McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl R McCarty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?