Engley Diversified Inc. v. City of Port Orchard
Plaintiff: Engley Diversified Inc.
Defendant: City of Port Orchard
Respondent: Donald M Ryan, Denver Gardens Co LLC, South Kitsap Mall Inc, Tom & Laurie LLC, Gordon M. & Linda M. Shaw Trust and B&J IP LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv05874
Filed: October 24, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part and denying in part 85 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 87 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.(TG)
July 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying 73 Motion to Disqualify by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MGC)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER REVERSING DECISION by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 54 Brief - Opening filed by Engley Diversified Inc. (TG)
August 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 47 Motion to Supplement the Record by Judge Benjamin H Settle.(TG)
April 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion for Reconsideration.(TG)
February 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle denying 12 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and denying 14 Motion for LUPA Scheduling Order.(TG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Engley Diversified Inc. v. City of Port Orchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Engley Diversified Inc.
Represented By: William John Crittenden
Represented By: Michael J Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Port Orchard
Represented By: Carol A Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Donald M Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Denver Gardens Co LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: South Kitsap Mall Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tom & Laurie LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gordon M. & Linda M. Shaw Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B&J IP LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?