United States of America v. Approximately One Million Seven Hundred Eighty Four Thousand (1,784,000) Contraband Cigarettes et al

Defendant: Approximately One Million Seven Hundred Eighty Four Thousand (1,784,000) Contraband Cigarettes, Approximately Seven Hundred Seven Thousand Eight Hundred (707,800) Contraband Cigarettes, $583,458.25 United States Currency, $152,412.00 United States Currency, 2007 Chevrolet Box Van, 2008 Chevrolet Silverado Pickup, 2008 Chevrolet Tahoe 4D, 2012 Mercedes-Benz Sprinter Van, 2004 Kia Sedona SUV, 2006 Dodge Ram 1500 Pickup, 2003 Hummer H2, 2008 Ford F150, $26,500.00 United States Funds and $359,197.59 United States Funds
Plaintiff: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2012cv05992
Filed: November 16, 2012
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 21:0881 Forfeiture Property - Automobile
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2016 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 57 Motion to Stay Discovery. 56 MOTION to Dismiss Claims of Nicholas Matheson and The Estate of Edward Comenout and 62 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment are RENOTED to 11/4/2016.(TG)
April 29, 2016 51 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 50 Stipulation filed by United States of America, Dennis Harris, Jr. (TG)
March 29, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss and denying 12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(MGC)
March 11, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H Settle granting 22 Motion for Leave to File Amended Verified Complaint.(TG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately One Million Seven Hundred Eighty Four Thousand (1,784,000) Contraband Cigarettes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately One Million Seven Hundred Eighty Four Thousand (1,784,000) Contraband Cigarettes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately Seven Hundred Seven Thousand Eight Hundred (707,800) Contraband Cigarettes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $583,458.25 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $152,412.00 United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2007 Chevrolet Box Van
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2008 Chevrolet Silverado Pickup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2008 Chevrolet Tahoe 4D
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2012 Mercedes-Benz Sprinter Van
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2004 Kia Sedona SUV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2006 Dodge Ram 1500 Pickup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2003 Hummer H2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2008 Ford F150
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $26,500.00 United States Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $359,197.59 United States Funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Richard Edward Cohen
Represented By: J Tate London
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?