Richey v. Obenland

Petitioner: Thomas WS Richey
Respondent: Obenland
Case Number: 3:2013cv05231
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Referring Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DECLINING TO ADOPT REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 49 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Thomas WilliamSinclair Richey. (TG)
June 8, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion for Extension of Time by Judge Karen L Strombom. Petition ready for consideration on 7/24/2015. (MET)
August 12, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H Settle re 23 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Thomas WS Richey. (TG; cc mailed to petitioner and emailed to Court of Appeals)
March 29, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why Petitioner's 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis should not be denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. Show Cause Response or payment of the filing fee due on or before 4/19/2013. (GMR- cc: petitioner)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richey v. Obenland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Thomas WS Richey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Obenland
Represented By: Alex A Kostin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?