Sherrill v. Warner

Plaintiff: Thurman F Sherrill
Defendant: Bernard Warner
Case Number: 3:2013cv05314
Filed: April 24, 2013
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Referring Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 30, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 16 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Thurman F Sherrill; defendant's motion for summary judgment is granted. Signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 10/30/2013 (DN). (cc to pltf)
April 30, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (GMR- cc: pltf)
May 1, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class Mail to all named defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. Service mailed on 5/1/2013. (GMR- cc: pltf w/copy of general order)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sherrill v. Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thurman F Sherrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Warner
Represented By: Candie M Dibble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.