McIalwain et al v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Matthew D McIalwain and Christine M McIalwain
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC, Doe Defendants 1-10, Bank of America NA, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Federal National Mortgage Association, Northwest Trustee Services, Inc. and Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP, a National Banking Association
Case Number: 3:2013cv06096
Filed: December 31, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert J Bryan
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2014. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2014 Filing 28 RETURN RECEIPT of Letter directed to Pierce County Superior Court re #27 Order on Remand (CMG)
March 14, 2014 Filing 27 Letter from Deputy Clerk to Pierce County Superior Court re #26 Order on Remand. (MET)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ON (1) DEFENDANTS GREEN TREE SERVICING, LLC, FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION, MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS, INC., AND NORTHWEST TRUSTEE SERVICES, INC.'S MOTION TO DISMISS AND (2) PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND, finding as moot #9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting #12 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
February 28, 2014 Filing 25 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Christine M McIalwain, Matthew D McIalwain, TO RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Supplement Declaration)(Jones, Richard)
February 28, 2014 Filing 24 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (McCormick, Jody)
February 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DIRECTING RESPONSE BY DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA N.A, renoting #12 MOTION to Remand , #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM to 2/28/2014. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
February 21, 2014 Filing 22 REPLY, filed by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, Green Tree Servicing, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Northwest Trustee Services, Inc., TO RESPONSE to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Thomas, John)
February 21, 2014 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, Green Tree Servicing, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.. (Thomas, John)
February 13, 2014 Filing 20 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Matthew D McIalwain. (Jones, Richard)
February 5, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND RENOTING MOTIONS, re #12 MOTION to Remand , #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM renoted to 2/21/2014. Plaintiff and defendant are ORDERED to show cause in writing, not later than February 21, 2014, if any they have, why this matter should not be stayed. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
February 4, 2014 Filing 18 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Christine M McIalwain, Matthew D McIalwain, TO RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B)(Jones, Richard)
February 3, 2014 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint; by Bank of America, N.A..(McCormick, Jody)
January 31, 2014 Filing 16 RESPONSE, by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, Green Tree Servicing, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Northwest Trustee Services, Inc., to #12 MOTION to Remand . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Remand)(Thomas, John)
January 29, 2014 Filing 15 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Christine M McIalwain, Matthew D McIalwain, to #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Exhibit F-J)(Jones, Richard)
January 17, 2014 Filing 14 NOTICE re: Consent to Removal ; filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (McCormick, Jody)
January 14, 2014 Filing 13 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, Green Tree Servicing, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State Court Case Information Sheet, #2 Exhibit B- State Court Order Assigning Case, #3 Exhibit C- State Court Notice to Defendants regarding Default, #4 Exhibit D- State Court Notice of Appearance for NWTS with Declaration of Service, #5 Exhibit E- State Court Notice of Appearance for Green Tree, Fannie Mae and MERS, #6 Exhibit F- State Court Declaration of Service of Notice of Appearance for Green Tree, Fannie Mae and MERS, #7 Exhibit G- State Court Affidavit of Service of the lawsuit on Fannie Mae, #8 Exhibit H- State Court Affidavit of Service of the lawsuit on MERS, #9 Exhibit I- State Court Affidavit of Service of the lawsuit on NWTS, #10 Exhibit J- State Court Notice of Appearance for Bank of America, N.A. with Declaration of Service, #11 Exhibit K- Superior Court Case Summary accessed on January 14, 2014)(Thomas, John)
January 13, 2014 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiffs Christine M McIalwain, Matthew D McIalwain. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion for Remand, #2 Declaration of Counsel, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Counsel, #4 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/7/2014, (Jones, Richard)
January 7, 2014 Filing 11 NOTICE Note for Hearing of Motion to Dismiss on Motion Calendar for February 7, 2014 - Oral Argument Requested ; filed by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, Green Tree Servicing, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.. (Thomas, John)
January 7, 2014 Filing 10 REQUEST for Judicial Notice in Support re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Recorded Notice of Discontinuance)(Thomas, John)
January 7, 2014 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, Green Tree Servicing, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 2/7/2014, (Thomas, John)
January 7, 2014 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America, N.A.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bank of America, N.A.. (McCormick, Jody)
January 3, 2014 JSR due 4/3/2014. (JL)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/20/2014; Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/27/2014; Joint Status Report due by 4/3/2014. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
January 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS. Authorized by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
January 2, 2014 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from Pierce County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ)
January 2, 2014 Judge Robert J. Bryan added. (DJ)
January 2, 2014 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1 Defendant(s) Bank of America, NA must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 1/9/2014.(DJ)
December 31, 2013 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Green Tree Servicing, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.. (Thomas, John)
December 31, 2013 Filing 3 DECLARATION of John Thomas re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, Green Tree Servicing, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint)(Thomas, John)
December 31, 2013 Filing 2 NOTICE to State Court & Parties of Removal ; filed by Defendants Federal National Mortgage Association, Green Tree Servicing, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.. (Thomas, John)
December 31, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Pierce County Superior Court, case number 13-2-12874-3; (Receipt # 0981-3462838), filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Northwest Trustee Services, Inc., Green Tree Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Court Docket Report, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet)(Thomas, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McIalwain et al v. Green Tree Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: John M Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Jody M McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: John M Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: John M Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services, Inc.
Represented By: John M Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans Servicing LP, a National Banking Association
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Jody M McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew D McIalwain
Represented By: Richard Llewelyn Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine M McIalwain
Represented By: Richard Llewelyn Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?