Bryan v. Glebe

Petitioner: Richard Wesley Bryan
Respondent: Pat Glebe
Case Number: 3:2014cv05147
Filed: February 20, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Referring Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to supplement the record. Respondent shall file his Answer to petitioners memorandum on or before October 17, 2016. The Answer will be treated in accordance with Local Rule CR 7.Accordingly, upon receipt of the Answer the Clerk will note the matter for consideration on the fourth Friday after the answer is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Richard Bryan, Prisoner ID: 893416)(CMG)
July 19, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND DECLINING TO ADOPT IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 36 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by Richard Wesley Bryan. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Richard Bryan, Prisoner ID: 893416)(TG)
January 25, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Respondent shall file and serve his answer to brief and relevant state court record on or before 3/7/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Richard Bryan, Prisoner ID: 893416)(CMG)
August 18, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 16 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Pat Glebe. (TG; cc mailed to petitioner)
February 21, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class/Certified Mail/Return Receipt Requested; mailed to Respondent & AG's office on 2/21/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. (CMG; cc to Petitioner w/instruction sheet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bryan v. Glebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard Wesley Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pat Glebe
Represented By: Ronda Denise Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?