Crowell et al v. Cowlitz County et al

Plaintiff: Jule Crowell and David Nelson
Defendant: Cowlitz County, John Does and Marin Fox Hight
Case Number: 3:2014cv05153
Filed: February 24, 2014
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Cowlitz
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2015 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 91 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 98 Motion for Summary Judgment; finding as moot 137 Motion to Exclude.(TG)
December 8, 2015 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part 107 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part 109 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part 120 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part 122 Motion for Summary Judgment; deny ing 130 Motion to Continue; granting in part 134 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part 138 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 158 Motion to Continue. Deal complaint is remanded to Cowlitz County Superior Court; Borelis and Bush complaint is dismissed. (TG)
November 2, 2015 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part and denying in part 88 Motion to Exclude; denying 93 Motion for Relief. Conmed may file a petition for fees by 11/10/2015, and plaintiffs may respond by 11/13/2015. (TG)
October 28, 2015 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 91 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Claims of Cameron Kuanoni filed by Conmed, Inc. and 98 MOTION for Summary Judgment re Claims of Kele Kuanoni. Motions are granted in part and the Court reserves ruling in part and requests parties to show cause by 11/6/2015 re remaining state claims. Motions are renoted to 11/6/2015. Dkt. 96, Plaintiffs' motion to continue is denied. (TG)
January 15, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 63 Motion for Extension of Time by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
November 21, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Consolidate by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. 28 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by David Nelson, Jule Crowell is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; 34 MOTION to Intervene filed by Conmed, Inc. is GRANTED; and 37 MOTION for Relief from Deadline filed by Jule Crowell is DENIED. ALL FURTHER PLEADINGS shall be filed using this case number and the other two cases are administratively closed. (TG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crowell et al v. Cowlitz County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jule Crowell
Represented By: John R. Connelly, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Duane C. Crandall(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nathan Paul Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Nelson
Represented By: John R. Connelly, Jr.(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Duane C. Crandall(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Nathan Paul Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cowlitz County
Represented By: Craig L. McIvor(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Marc Rosenberg(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marin Fox Hight
Represented By: Craig L. McIvor
Represented By: Marc Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?