Clark County Bancorporation v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Clark County Bancorporation
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation and Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation-Receiver
Case Number: 3:2014cv05816
Filed: October 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clark
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER GRANTING (172) Motion to Dismiss and DENYING (175) Motion for Summary Judgment, (179) Motion for Status Conference and 180 Motion Pursuant to Rule 56(d). Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting 193 Stipulated Motion to modify scheduling order, as follows: Motions in Limine should be filed by 11/16/2018, Agreed Pretrial Order filed with the Court by 12/21/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/19 at 1:30 p.m., Trial briefs/proposed voir dire/jury instructions/agreed neutral statement of the case/deposition designations due by 1/29/2019, and Trial is set for 2/19/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(CMG)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 129 Motion to Compel; requesting supplemental response from Plaintiff and renoting 132 MOTION for Contempt : Noting Date 2/9/2018.(TG)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER denying 96 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 104 Motion to strike; denying 105 Motion for Protective Order; granting 107 Motion to set briefing schedule. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER denying 89 Motion for Mediation by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER denying 77 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Plaintiff to file new complaint consistent with its voluntary withdrawal of claims. The Court also requests responses to the issue of consolidation by 2/12/2016. (TG)
October 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 71 Motion to Strike; Motions terminated: 65 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM re [Dkt 59] Second Amended Complaint filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation-Receiver. FDIC shall respond to complaint by 10/22/2015. (TG)
June 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part and denying in part 40 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff may amend their complaint by June 26, 2015. (TG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark County Bancorporation v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark County Bancorporation
Represented By: Stephen Garrett Leatham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation-Receiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?