Smith et al v. Washington State et al
Plaintiff: Robert Smith, Michael Johnson, Doug Car and Glenn Tilton
Defendant: Washington State, Washington State Attorney General's Office, Bob Ferguson, Christine Gregoire, Washington State Department of Corrections, Local 117 Teamsters, Washington State Department of Social and Health Services, Kevin W Quigley, John Clayton, Washington State Special Commitment Center, Mark Strong, Leslie Sziebert, Cathi Harris, Holly Coryell, Crystal McCabe, Richard Steinbach, Unknown State Offices or Entities, John Doe, Jane Doe, Washington Federation of State Employees and Todd Dubble
Case Number: 3:2014cv05974
Filed: December 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 231 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 223 GRANTING Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to claims for injunctive relief, those claims are DISMISSED with prejudice; DENYING Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment as to damages claims; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. The Court hereby appoints Paul Meiklejohn and Stefan Szpajda of the law firm Dorsey and Whitney LLP. Counsel are directed to file a Notice of Appearance on or before December 2, 2019. On or before December 20, 2019, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report. (GMR- cc: pltfs; ad hoc NEF to appointed counsel)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER denying 202 OBJECTIONS re 201 Magistrate Judge's Order Appointing Pro Bono Counsel, signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (cc: Pltfs)(DK)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER DIRECTING PRO BONO COORDINATOR TO IDENTIFY PRO BONO COUNSEL AND GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION AND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. The 193 Motion to Appoint Counsel is granted, contingent on the identification of counsel willing to represent plaintiff in this matter. The 196 Motion for an extension and scheduling order is granted in part and denied in part. The Clerk is directed to remove defendants' 191 Motion from the Court's calendar at this time. (cc: pro bono coordinator) (GMR- cc: pltfs)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 179 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Calvin Malone, George O Mitchell, Darren Perkins, Darrell Kent; DENYING plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING defendants' cross-motion for summary judgment; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 3/16/2018 (DN). (cc to pltfs)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER that Defendants' 164 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time is denied as moot. Plaintiffs' request 166 for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery is GRANTED. The deadline to file dispositive motions is extended to 12/29/17. The Clerk is directed to re-note the 167 MOTION for Summary Judgment to 12/29/2017. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG)(cc mailed to Plaintiffs)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 152 Motion for Sanctions and 153 Motion to Substitute; by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(GMR- cc: pltfs)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura, Granting in part and Denying in part Defendants' 138 Motion for Protective Order; and detailing the Court's Order in the March 8, 2017 telephonic conference. (GMR- cc: 4 pltfs)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 129 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery: Discovery to be completed by 4/3/2017, and Dispositive motions now due by 5/3/2017; denying 132 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG)(cc mailed to Plaintiffs)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting 127 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. Attorney Spencer Nathan Thal terminated. (CMG)(cc to Plaintiffs)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER denying 122 Plaintiff's Letter Request by Judge J Richard Creatura. (MET) cc: plaintiffs
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER denying 109 Motion for Sanctions signed by Judge J Richard Creatura. (MET) cc: plaintiffs
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER Denying 106 Motion for Judicial Review of Redacted Material, by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(GMR- cc: pltfs)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Denying 100 Motion for Class Action Certification, by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (GMR- cc: pltfs)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 92 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and denying as moot, Plaintiffs' Motions to Proceed in forma pauperis (Dkt 95 , 96 , 97 , 98 ); by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(GMR- cc: plaintiffs)
December 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 74 Objections to Report and Recommendation: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 64 as to Quigley, Clayton, Strong, Dubble, Steinbach, Sziebert, Harris, and McCabe is DENIED; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 64 as to Ferguson, Gregoire, Coryell, John Doe, and Jane Doe is GRANTED and these defendants are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 64 Plaintiffs' claims of violations of the right to access the courts and right to a grievance process is GRANTED, these claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 12/17/2015 (DN). (cc pltfs Mitchell, Perkins, Kent, Malone)
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying 81 Motion for leave to file amicus curiae, interpreted as a Request to take judicial notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG; cc to Plaintiffs & Mr. Mujahid-Leck.)
August 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER denying 65 Motion for Reconsideration; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 8/11/2015 (DN). (cc to pltfs Malone, Kent, Perkins, Mitchell)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO PERFECT SERVICE on defendant Denny within 120 days of the filing of plaintiffs' third 66 Amended Complaint, on or before September 28, 2015; by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (GMR- cc: plaintiffs)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying 31 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (GMR- cc: 4 pltfs)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 45 ; granting 8 Defendant Teamsters Local Union No. 117's Motion to Dismiss; granting 12 Defendant WFSE's Motion to Dismiss; granting 19 Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint within 21 days of this order; Striking as Moot [24, 26, 28]; denying 39 Plaintiffs' Motion for Default; Referring 31 to Magistrate Judge J. Richard Creatura; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN) Modified on 5/6/2015 (DN). (cc to all pltfs)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Washington State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Car
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Tilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Attorney General's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Gregoire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 117 Teamsters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Social and Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin W Quigley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Special Commitment Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Sziebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathi Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Coryell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Steinbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown State Offices or Entities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Federation of State Employees
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Dubble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?