Jackson v. Larson et al
Plaintiff: Tony J Jackson
Defendant: Ryan Larson, Lakewood Police Dept, City of Lakewood, Lakewood Towing and Homeland Security Investigations
Case Number: 3:2015cv05258
Filed: April 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying 46 Motion for the Clerk to Serve Subpoena, signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.(CMG)(cc to Plaintiff)
November 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER adopting the 50 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. This case against defendants City of Lakewood and Ryan Larson is Dismissed With Prejudice. Plaintiff and defendants City of Lakewood and Ryan Larson shall bear their own costs and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.(CMG)(cc to Plaintiff)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ADOPTING 43 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. The action against defendant Reeseburg is dismissed without prejudice.(MET) cc: plaintiff
August 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 20 MOTION to substitute defendant. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint on or before 9/25/15. If plaintiff fails to submit a complete amended complaint by that date, this action will proceed on the original complaint (Dkt. 4). Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG)(cc to Plaintiff)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 23 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to petitioner at Seatac FDC . Modified on 8/17/2015 (JL).
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that Plaintiff is directed to provide the complete addresses for defendants Lakewood Police Department and Homeland Security Investigations so the Court can again attempt service by mail. These addresses must be provided to the Court on or before 7/24/15 or the Court will recommend dismissal of his action for failure to prosecute as the unserved defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG) cc to Plaintiff via mail
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by 1st Class Mail. Mailed to Defendants on 5/4/15. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG; cc to Plaintiff w/instruction sheet)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Larson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony J Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Larson
Represented By: George A Mix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakewood Police Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Lakewood
Represented By: George A Mix
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lakewood Towing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homeland Security Investigations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?