Slaughter v. Glebe et al
Plaintiff: Ossie Lee Slaughter
Defendant: Pat Glebe, Dan Vanogle, Erik Jackson, Bernard Warner, C. Casey, Jones, Dennis Cherry, Dennis Persell, Kerri McTarsney, Smith, Flemming, Presswood, Nelson, Pam Perdue, Gregory Jones, Marcia McCormick, McCrae, Kautz, Randy Smith, Brule, Casey, Lisa Ross, Hansen, Thomas L'heureux, Brian Schuetter and Davis
Case Number: 3:2015cv05484
Filed: July 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Grays Harbor
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 236 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Ossie Lee Slaughter. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(TG)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 224 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by Ossie Lee Slaughter. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(TG)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 223 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 208 Report and Recommendations. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(TG)
March 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura Denying 215 Motion to Supplement; and Denying 217 Motion to Compel. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(GMR)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER that Plaintiff's 184 motion to compel and motion for discovery expert are denied as moot; and plaintiff's 201 Motion for Extension of Time is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(CMG)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 203 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Ossie Lee Slaughter. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(TG)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 179 Motion for Extension of Time; 177 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 169 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Ossie Lee Slaughter: Noting Date 2/23/2018.**1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(TG)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 170 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(CMG)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER denying the 156 Motion for Order to Show Cause, for injunctive relief, and for a telephonic hearing; granting the 160 Motion for Extension of Time. The discovery deadline is extended to 11/27/2017 and the deadline for dispositive motions is extended to 1/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(CMG)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER striking Plaintiff's 151 Motion for Tentative Agreement Negotiated Settlement Offer Proposal to Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(CMG)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 141 Motion for Telephonic Hearing; denying 142 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiff shall not file any more motions for reconsideration relating to his motion for preliminary injunction (Dkt. 128). **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(TG)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER Vacating in Part Previous 134 Order; Adopting 133 Report and Recommendation re Denying 128 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and Denying 136 Motion For Reconsideration; by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.**5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(GMR)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER Denying Objections and Adopting Reports and Recommendations re 124 Report and Recommendations & 133 Report and Recommendations. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. **5 PAGES, PRINT ALL** (Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869) (MGC)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER denying 116 Motion for Telephonic Hearing; denying 118 Motion for Pretrial Conference; denying 122 Motion for Leave; denying 126 Motion for Hearing signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(MET)
January 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 106 Motion for Reconsideration.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Ossie Slaughter, Prisoner ID: 827869)(TG)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying 79 Motion for Telephonic Conference and Planning for Discovery Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG)cc: to plaintiff
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 75 Report and Recommendations. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
March 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying 74 Motion for Reconsideration by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
February 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 66 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Ossie Lee Slaughter. Plaintiff to file amended complaint by 3/18/2016. (TG; cc mailed to plaintiff)
January 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER that Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE why this action should not be dismissed against the unserved defendants without prejudice for failure to prosecute, failure to comply with a court order, and failure to perfect service of process. Show Cause Response due by 2/16/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG)cc: plaintiff
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 56 Motion to Compel; denying 57 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Judge J Richard Creatura.(MET) cc: plaintiff
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slaughter v. Glebe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ossie Lee Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pat Glebe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Vanogle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Cherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Persell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerri McTarsney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flemming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Presswood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Perdue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCrae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kautz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas L'heureux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Schuetter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?