Wodja v. Washington State Employees Credit Union et al

Plaintiff: Todd Wodja
Defendant: Washington State Employees Credit Union and Does 1-10
Case Number: 3:2015cv05693
Filed: September 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 48 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction.(TG)
June 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 32 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 29 Stipulated Motion. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 5/20/2016, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/3/2016, Joint Status Report due by 6/10/2016. Plaintiff to file Second Amended Complaint by 3/11/2016; Defendant to file Motion to Dismiss by 3/25/2016; and deadline for filing motion for class certification is extended to 9/30/2016. (TG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wodja v. Washington State Employees Credit Union et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Wodja
Represented By: A Richard Dykstra
Represented By: Richard H Friedman
Represented By: Taras Kick Kihiczak(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Eddie Jae K Kim(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Richard D McCune(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas Segal(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Employees Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?