Tarsia v. Joint Base Lewis McChord Provost Marshal Office et al
Plaintiff: Christian Jay Tarsia
Defendant: Joint Base Lewis McChord Provost Marshal Office, Michael A Dearborn, Charles Sikes and Christopher Koch
Case Number: 3:2015cv05739
Filed: October 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 00 U.S.C. ยง 0000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 45 Defendant Koch's Motion for Summary Judgment; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 5/20/2019 (DN). (cc to pltf)
January 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 37 Defendant Sikes' Motion for Summary Judgment; Charles Sikes (ONLY) is DISMISSED from this case; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 1/23/2019 (DN). (cc to pltf)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 20 Defendant Dearborn's Motion for Summary Judgment; Michael Dearborn (ONLY) is DISMISSED with prejudice; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN) Modified on 5/15/2017 (DN). (cc to pltf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarsia v. Joint Base Lewis McChord Provost Marshal Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christian Jay Tarsia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joint Base Lewis McChord Provost Marshal Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Dearborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Sikes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Koch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?