Ejonga-Deogracias v. Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: JoJo Ejonga-Deogracias
Defendant: Department of Corrections, Leon N Kershaw and Carolee Roop
Case Number: 3:2015cv05784
Filed: October 29, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Presiding Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 82 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal, this Matter is Dismissed Without Prejudice; signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(JoJo Ejonga-Deogracias, Prisoner ID: 366372)(GMR)
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ADOPTING the 76 Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's motion for default judgment against defendant Bill Hamby 57 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(JoJo Ejonga-Deogracias, Prisoner ID: 366372)(CMG)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting 63 Motion for Extension of Time - Plaintiff may have until 4/9/18 to file a second amended complaint; denying 65 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and denying 71 Motion to Stay. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke.**4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(JoJo Ejonga-Deogracias, Prisoner ID: 366372)(CMG)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER regarding the 64 Notice of Appeal: A final judgment has not been entered. Despite the Notice of Appeal, this Court still has jurisdiction over the case. This case remains referred to U.S. Magistrate Judge Theresa L. Fricke for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(JoJo Ejonga-Deogracias, Prisoner ID: 366372)(CMG)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER that the 60 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION IS ADOPTED to the extent it recommends dismissal of the claims asserted against Defendant Superintendent Holbrook in the Amended Complaint. Plaintiff, if he chooses, may file a second amended co mplaint on or before December 15, 2017, and this case is RE-REFERRED to U.S. Magistrate Judge Theresa L. Fricke for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. **5 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(JoJo Ejonga-Deogracias, Prisoner ID: 366372)(CMG)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ADOPTING 42 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, by Judge Robert J. Bryan. Plaintiff's motion for temporary injunction 36 IS DENIED. **1 PAGE, PRINT ALL**(JoJo Ejonga-Deogracias, Prisoner ID: 366372)(GMR)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 25 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by JoJo Ejonga-Deogracias signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(JoJo Ejonga-Deogracias, Prisoner ID: 366372)(MET)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 13 Motion for Preservation of Evidence, by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom. **2 PAGES, PRINT ALL** (JoJo Ejonga-Deogracias, Prisoner ID: 366372) (GMR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ejonga-Deogracias v. Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoJo Ejonga-Deogracias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leon N Kershaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolee Roop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?