Burton v. Schneider et al
Plaintiff: Lonnie Burton
Defendant: Tracy Schneider, Ron Haynes and Robert Herzog
Case Number: 3:2015cv05862
Filed: November 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clallam
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Judge Benjamin H. Settle requesting additional briefing and renoting Plaintiff's motion. 40 MOTION for Order filed by Lonnie Burton RENOTED to 10/13/2017. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Lonnie Burton, Prisoner ID: 978598)(TG)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 32 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Lonnie Burton. **10 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Lonnie Burton, Prisoner ID: 978598)(TG)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Amend. The Clerk is ordered to docket plaintiff's proposed amended complaint (Dkt. 14-1) as his amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG)cc: Plaintiff
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE by Judge J Richard Creatura. Mailed via 1st Class on 12/14/15 to Defendants & AG. (MET) cc: plaintiff w/pro se sheet.
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burton v. Schneider et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lonnie Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tracy Schneider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Herzog
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?