Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Giroux et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Kevin Rhee, Andy Rhee, Lisa H Rhee, So Y Rhee, Chong W Rhee, Richard Giroux and Chong C Rhee
Case Number: 3:2015cv05954
Filed: December 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H Settle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re #30 Stipulation filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (TG)
January 27, 2017 Filing 30 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by parties (Foley, Douglas)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying #25 Motion for Attorney Fees by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG)
December 8, 2016 Filing 28 REPLY, filed by Counter Claimants Andy Rhee, Kevin Rhee, Lisa H Rhee, So Y Rhee, Defendants Andy Rhee, Kevin Rhee, Lisa H Rhee, So Y Rhee, TO RESPONSE to #25 MOTION for Attorney Fees (LePley, Patrick)
December 5, 2016 Filing 27 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, to #25 MOTION for Attorney Fees . (Foley, Douglas)
November 23, 2016 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Patrick H. LePley filed by Counter Claimants Andy Rhee, Kevin Rhee, Lisa H Rhee, So Y Rhee, Defendants Andy Rhee, Kevin Rhee, Lisa H Rhee, So Y Rhee re #25 MOTION for Attorney Fees (LePley, Patrick)
November 23, 2016 Filing 25 MOTION for Attorney Fees by Counter Claimants Andy Rhee, Kevin Rhee, Lisa H Rhee, So Y Rhee, Defendants Andy Rhee, Kevin Rhee, Lisa H Rhee, So Y Rhee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 12/9/2016, (LePley, Patrick)
November 9, 2016 Filing 24 RESPONSE by Counter Claimants Andy Rhee, Kevin Rhee, Lisa H Rhee, So Y Rhee, Defendants Andy Rhee, Kevin Rhee, Lisa H Rhee, So Y Rhee re #23 Notice-Other re Mootness (LePley, Patrick)
November 7, 2016 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOOTNESS OF DECLARATORY JUDGMENT ACTION ; filed by Plaintiff Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Foley, Douglas)
July 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #16 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG)
June 16, 2016 Filing 21 Second DECLARATION of Douglas Foley in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiff Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company re #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Foley, Douglas)
June 16, 2016 Filing 20 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, TO RESPONSE to #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Foley, Douglas)
June 13, 2016 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Patrick H. LePley filed by Counter Claimants Andy Rhee, Kevin Rhee, Lisa H Rhee, So Y Rhee, Defendants Andy Rhee, Kevin Rhee, Lisa H Rhee, So Y Rhee re #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh. 1, #2 Exhibit Exh. 2)(LePley, Patrick)
June 13, 2016 Filing 18 RESPONSE, by Counter Claimants Andy Rhee, Kevin Rhee, Lisa H Rhee, So Y Rhee, Defendants Andy Rhee, Kevin Rhee, Lisa H Rhee, So Y Rhee, to #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (LePley, Patrick)
May 20, 2016 Filing 17 DECLARATION of Douglas F. Foley filed by Plaintiff Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company re #16 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Foley, Douglas)
May 20, 2016 Filing 16 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 6/17/2016, (Foley, Douglas)
May 20, 2016 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Richard Giroux on 4/21/2016, filed by Plaintiff Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Foley, Douglas)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES - *FIVE DAY* Bench Trial is set for 4/25/2017 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Joinder of Parties due by 6/15/2016, Amended Pleadings due by 6/27/2016, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/17/2016, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 11/16/2016, Motions due by 11/28/2016, Discovery completed by 12/27/2016, Dispositive motions due by 1/25/2017, Motions in Limine due by 3/20/2017, Pretrial Order due by 4/3/2017, Trial briefs to be submitted by 4/4/2017, Deposition Designations due by 4/4/2017, Pretrial Conference set for 4/10/2017 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom E before Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
May 5, 2016 Filing 13 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: five. Filed by Plaintiff Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Foley, Douglas)
April 8, 2016 Filing 12 PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO RHEE DEFENDANTS COUNTERCLAIM ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company.(Foley, Douglas)
April 8, 2016 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification - ACTION REQUIRED re #11 INCORRECT EVENT USED/DOCUMENT TO BE RE-FILED REPLY by Plaintiff Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO RHEE DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIMS. Please re-file the Answer to Counterclaim using the correct event "Answer to Counterclaim" under "Initial Pleadings and Service - Answers to Complaints". If you have questions, require assistance or are interested in receiving refresher training, please feel free to call the Helpdesk at 206-370-8440. Thank you. (GMR)
April 7, 2016 Filing 11 INCORRECT EVENT USED/DOCUMENT TO BE RE-FILED REPLY by Plaintiff Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO RHEE DEFENDANTS' COUNTERCLAIMS (Foley, Douglas) Modified on 4/8/2016 (GMR).
April 1, 2016 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on So Y. Rhee on 3/31/2016, filed by Plaintiff Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company, Counter Defendant Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Foley, Douglas)
March 23, 2016 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Andy Rhee aka Chong C. Rhee and Lisa H. Rhee on 2/16/2016, filed by Plaintiff Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Foley, Douglas)
March 23, 2016 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on Kevin Rhee aka Chong Rhee on 2/12/2016, filed by Plaintiff Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Foley, Douglas)
March 15, 2016 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against plaintiff Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company by So Y Rhee, Lisa H Rhee, Andy Rhee, Kevin Rhee.(LePley, Patrick)
March 8, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Patrick H LePley on behalf of Defendants Andy Rhee, Kevin Rhee, Lisa H Rhee, So Y Rhee. (LePley, Patrick)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 5/5/2016, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/14/2016, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/28/2016, by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (TG)
January 5, 2016 Filing 3 Summonses Issued Electronically as to defendants Richard Giroux, Andy Rhee, Kevin Rhee, Lisa H Rhee, So Y Rhee. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(GMR)
January 5, 2016 Judge Benjamin H. Settle added. (GMR)
December 31, 2015 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Foley, Douglas)
December 31, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants (Receipt # 0981-4285095), filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(Foley, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Giroux et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Rhee
Represented By: Patrick H LePley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Rhee
Represented By: Patrick H LePley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa H Rhee
Represented By: Patrick H LePley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: So Y Rhee
Represented By: Patrick H LePley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chong W Rhee
Represented By: Patrick H LePley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Giroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chong C Rhee
Represented By: Patrick H LePley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Douglas F Foley
Represented By: Vernon Scott Finley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?