Gallagher v. Department of Corrections of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Douglas E Gallagher
Defendant: Department of Corrections of Washington, Katrina Henry, Edie Kroha, Clifford J Johnson and Dale Fetroe
Case Number: 3:2016cv05088
Filed: February 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Clallam
Presiding Judge: Ronald B. Leighton
Presiding Judge: Karen L Strombom
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER denying 132 Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton.(DN)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND DECLINING TO ADOPT IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 127 Report and Recommendations; Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED; Plaintiff's Motion to Strike is GRANTED; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER that defendants' 100 Motion for Relief from the dispositive motion deadline is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke.(CMG)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER that plaintiff's 84 MOTION to Exclude Defendants' Experts, is re-noted for October 12, 2018. Plaintiff's 95 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , is re-noted for 10/12/2018. The oral argument on plaintiff's motion to exclude defendants' expert witnesses, 84 , will be scheduled for 9:30 a.m. on October 18, 2018, for 20 minutes per side. The oral argument on motion for partial summary judgment, 95 , will be scheduled for 10:15 a.m. on October 18, 2018, for 20 minutes per side. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. (CMG)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND DECLINING TO ADOPT IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 67 ; Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by Department of Corrections, Ron Haynes, Steven Hammond, Edie Kroha, Katrina Henry, Clifford J Johnson, Mi ke Holthe, Dan Pacholke, Dale Fetroe, State of Washington, and Kevin Bovenkamp; Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 44 is GRANTED in Part and DENIED in part as more fully set forth in the Order; Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 40 is DENIED and his Motion for Preliminary Injunction 51 is DENIED without prejudice; signed by Judge Ronald B. Leighton. (DN)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER reconsidering the Plaintiff's motion and the Court's previous order sua sponte and GRANTING Plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel 32 . The court appoints Jesse Froehling to serve as counsel for Mr. Gallagher. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa L Fricke. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Douglas Gallagher, Prisoner ID: 266279)(CMG)(cc of order adhoc'd to the CJA Coordinator)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER denying 28 Motion to Compel and for attorney fees, signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.**7 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Douglas Gallagher, Prisoner ID: 266279)(CMG)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 32 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Judge Karen L Strombom.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Douglas Gallagher, Prisoner ID: 266279)(MET)
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying as moot the 18 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG)cc: to Plaintiff
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO IDENTIFY OPERATIVE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT signed by Judge Karen L Strombom. Plaintiff shall notify the Court by June 9, 2016.(MET) cc: plaintiff
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 Stipulated Motion for leave to file second amended complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L Strombom.(CMG)(cc to Plaintiff)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallagher v. Department of Corrections of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas E Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Corrections of Washington
Represented By: Gauri Shrotriya Locker
Represented By: Deborah A Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrina Henry
Represented By: Gauri Shrotriya Locker
Represented By: Deborah A Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edie Kroha
Represented By: Gauri Shrotriya Locker
Represented By: Deborah A Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clifford J Johnson
Represented By: Gauri Shrotriya Locker
Represented By: Deborah A Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dale Fetroe
Represented By: Gauri Shrotriya Locker
Represented By: Deborah A Severson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?