Alvarez v. Inslee et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Alvarez
Defendant: Governor Jay Inslee, Service Employees International Union Healthcare 775NW ("SEIU 775"), SEIU Healthcare NW Training Partnership and Patricia Lashway
Case Number: 3:2016cv05111
Filed: February 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, granting 91 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 95 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 100 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 106 Motion to Seal; striking 120 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND REQUEST FOR RELIEF FROM DISCOVERY DEADLINE, granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion to Compel. Discovery deadline is reset to 1/31/2017. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.(JL)
September 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Amend. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint by 9/26/16. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan.(JL)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER ON SEIU HEALTHCARE NW TRAINING PARTNERSHIP'S MOTION TO DISMISS PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 12(B)(6), granting 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff may file an Amended Complaint on or before June 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez v. Inslee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Alvarez
Represented By: James Gideon Abernathy
Represented By: David M.S. Dewhirst
Represented By: Stephanie Olson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Jay Inslee
Represented By: Susan Sackett-Danpullo
Represented By: Alicia O Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Employees International Union Healthcare 775NW ("SEIU 775")
Represented By: Scott A Kronland(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Michael C Subit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SEIU Healthcare NW Training Partnership
Represented By: Eleanor Hamburger
Represented By: Richard E Spoonemore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Lashway
Represented By: Susan Sackett-Danpullo
Represented By: Alicia O Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?