Dunn v. Pierce County et al
Plaintiff: James W Dunn
Defendant: Pierce County, Ara D Steben and Angela M Steben
Case Number: 3:2016cv05148
Filed: February 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 23 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 27 Motion for Summary Judgment.(TG)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 21 Stipulated Motion. Discovery completed by 12/31/2016.(TG)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part and denying in part 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 12 Motion for Default. Plaintiff has until 4/22/2016 to file an amended complaint. (TG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunn v. Pierce County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W Dunn
Represented By: Jonathan W. Blado
Represented By: Douglas N Kiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce County
Represented By: Stephen D. Trinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ara D Steben
Represented By: Stephen D. Trinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela M Steben
Represented By: Stephen D. Trinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?