Crow v. Hayes
Petitioner: Tommy Lee Crow, Jr
Respondent: Ron Hayes
Case Number: 3:2016cv05277
Filed: April 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER denying 71 Objections to 68 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Tommy Crow, Prisoner ID: 773446) (ERA)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER adopting 68 Report and Recommendations, signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. The habeas petition is denied, and the matter is closed. A certificate of appealability shall issue. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Tommy Crow, Prisoner ID: 773446) (ERA)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER continuing stay: The Court confirms it has received 36 petitioner's status update. This matter continues to be stayed until 30 days after the Washington state court has ruled on petitioner's challenge to his judgment and sentence. **SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS** The clerk is directed to note a due date for petitioner's next status report on this case's docket 90 days from the entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Tommy Crow, Prisoner ID: 773446)(CMG)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that matter continues to be stayed. Petitioner shall continue to file a status report every 90 days. Within 30 days of the Washington court's ruling on petitioner's challenge to his judgment and sentence, either party may file a motion to lift the stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Tommy Crow, Prisoner ID: 773446)(CMG)
February 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that the stay on petitioner's case remains in effect until 30 days after the state courts enter final judgment. Petitioner is instructed to provide the Court with another status report on or before 6/1/2018, or notify the Court when the state court enters final judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Tommy Crow, Prisoner ID: 773446)(CMG)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 22 Motion to Stay: This matter is stayed until 30 days after the Washington state courts have ruled on petitioner's appeal of his new judgment and sentence. Petitioner shall file a status report every 90 days. The current due date to file answer, 2/12/17, is stricken. The Clerk's office is directed to note a due date on the Court's calendar 90 days from the entry of this order and strike the 12/9/16 deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Tommy Crow, Prisoner ID: 773446)(CMG)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 15 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL) Paper copy sent to plaintiff @ Clallam County address . Modified on 8/29/2016 (JL).
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG)cc: Plaintiff
July 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by Tommy Lee Crow, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. Show Cause Response due by 8/12/2016. (CMG)cc: Petitioner
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner shall file his amended petition by 6/20/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.(CMG)(cc to Petitioner w/blank form)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that petitioner file an amended petition, specifically identifying a concise statement of the grounds raised in his petition by May 20, 2016. Failure to file an amended petition shall be deemed a failure to properly prosecute this matter and the Court will recommend dismissal of this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura. (CMG)cc to Petitioner
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crow v. Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tommy Lee Crow, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ron Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?