Wilson v. State of Washington et al
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L Wilson
Defendant: State of Washington, Washington State Department of Social & Health Services, Bob Ferguson and Does 1-50
Case Number: 3:2016cv05366
Filed: May 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 80 Motion for Summary Judgment.(TG)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER granting 57 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 71 Motion for Reconsideration; 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment: Noting Date 10/2/2017.(TG)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle DENYING 59 Plaintiff's motion to continue, and GRANTING in part and RESERVING RULING in part 57 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Motion 57 RENOTED to 9/15/2017. (TG)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part and denying in part 33 Motion to Compel; granting 39 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. Defendants shall respond to plaintiff's interrogatories and 4th, 10th, and 11th requests for production within 30 days from the date of this order. (TG)
September 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 15 Motion to Amend. Counsel is directed to e-file their Amended Complaint..(TG)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 11 Motion for Leave to Amend.(TG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. State of Washington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey L Wilson
Represented By: Darryl Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Washington
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Bartels
Represented By: Fred C Wist, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington State Department of Social & Health Services
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Bartels
Represented By: Fred C Wist, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Ferguson
Represented By: Jeremy Scott Bartels
Represented By: Fred C Wist, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?