Stone et al v. Government Employees Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Megan Stone and Christine Carosi
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Casualty Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company and GEICO Choice Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2016cv05383
Filed: May 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER denying 139 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle requesting response re 139 MOTION for Reconsideration. 139 MOTION for Reconsideration re 135 Order on Motion to Remand: Noting Date 10/20/2017. (TG)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 116 Motion to Seal; denying 122 Motion to Seal; denying 131 Motion to Seal; and removing documents listed in order from the record. (TG) (Main Document 136 replaced on 9/21/2017) (TG).
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER denying 112 Motion to Remand signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 89 Motion to Compel.(TG)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle denying 74 Motion re confidentiality designation; denying 78 Motion to Seal.(TG)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 11 Motion to Dismiss by Judge Benjamin H. Settle; GEICO Choice Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Company, GEICO Secure Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Company, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company and GEICO Casualty Company terminated. (TG) (Main Document 65 replaced on 1/17/2017) (TG).
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' 16 Motion to Remand and Denying as Moot Defendant's 39 Motion for Stay Pending Appeal, by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (GMR)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Remand by Judge Benjamin H. Settle.(TG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stone et al v. Government Employees Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Stone
Represented By: Stephen M Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Carosi
Represented By: Stephen M Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government Employees Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie L Bloomfield
Represented By: Andrea H McNeely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie L Bloomfield
Represented By: Andrea H McNeely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Stephanie L Bloomfield
Represented By: Andrea H McNeely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Stephanie L Bloomfield
Represented By: Andrea H McNeely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Secure Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie L Bloomfield
Represented By: Andrea H McNeely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie L Bloomfield
Represented By: Andrea H McNeely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Choice Insurance Company
Represented By: Stephanie L Bloomfield
Represented By: Andrea H McNeely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?