Mendoza et al v. City of Vancouver et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Mendoza
Defendant: City of Vancouver, Monica Hernandez, Barbara Kipp, John Doe Hernandez, John Doe Kipp and Vancouver Police Department
Case Number: 3:2016cv05677
Filed: August 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Bryan
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER ON RESPONSES TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND REMANDING CASE. This case IS REMANDED to Clark County, Washington Superior Court. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER ON CROSS MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND OTHER MOTIONS AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, granting 58 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 68 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; striking 73 Motion to Exclude. Responses to Order to Show Cause due 9/7/17. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCLUDE EXPERT WITNESS, by Judge Robert J. Bryan.(DK)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 19 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert J. Bryan. (JL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendoza et al v. City of Vancouver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vancouver
Represented By: Daniel G Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel G Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Kipp
Represented By: Daniel G Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Hernandez
Represented By: Daniel G Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Kipp
Represented By: Daniel G Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vancouver Police Department
Represented By: Daniel G Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Mendoza
Represented By: Jonathan Moffitt
Represented By: Gary Alan Preble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?