Moseley v. Washington Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: James Dale Moseley
Defendant: Washington Department of Corrections, Ryan Pfaff, Christine Brule, Ashley Zuber, Rainer and IMS Committee
Case Number: 3:2016cv05698
Filed: August 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Mason
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 68 Objections to Report and Recommendation filed by James Dale Moseley. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Moseley, Prisoner ID: 322627)(TG)
May 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying the 44 Motion to Compel and denying the 47 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Moseley, Prisoner ID: 322627)(CMG)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 30 Motion to Amend and DIRECTING Defendants to File Answer; Defendants' answer to the Amended Complaint (Dkt #34) is due 2/20/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Moseley, Prisoner ID: 322627)(CMG)
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 28 Report and Recommendations. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Moseley, Prisoner ID: 322627)(TG)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying 24 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(James Moseley, Prisoner ID: 322627)(CMG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moseley v. Washington Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Dale Moseley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Pfaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christine Brule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashley Zuber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMS Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?