Acosta-Espinosa v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Isaac Acosta-Espinosa
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 3:2016cv05831
Filed: September 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Thurston
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting in part Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Attorney Fees signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER reversing and remanding case for further administrative proceedings under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Answer due 2/22/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Clerk's note: Nancy A. Berryhill substituted for Carolyn W. Colvin as defendant in this suit (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acosta-Espinosa v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Acosta-Espinosa
Represented By: Jeanette Laffoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Kerry Jane Keefe(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Represented By: Michael Reid Tunick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?