Miller v. Gilbert et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Miller
Defendant: Margaret Gilbert, Daniel Van Ogle and Lt. McCarty
Case Number: 3:2016cv05891
Filed: October 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Grays Harbor
Presiding Judge: J Richard Creatura
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER denying 148 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL** (Christopher Miller, Prisoner ID: 632688) (MGC)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 132 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. The Clerk shall identify an attorney from the Court's Pro Bono Panel to represent Miller. After that, the Court will issue an order appointing the attorney. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Christopher Miller, Prisoner ID: 632688)(GMR)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER ADOPTING the 126 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. Defendants motion for summary judgment, Dkt. 90, is DENIED on Millers negligence claims against Hudson, Ellis, and Wilbur and medical malpractice claim agains t Hudson and GRANTED on the remainder of Millers state law claims. The parties shall meet and confer and then submit a joint status report regarding a schedule for trial **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Christopher Miller, Prisoner ID: 632688)(SP)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND DECLINING IN PART Report and Recommendations re 105 Objections to R&R & 109 Objections to R&R. Case is Re-Referred to Magistrate Judge J. Richard Creatura. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. **7 PAGES, PRINT ALL** (Christopher Miller, Prisoner ID: 632688) (MGC)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying 71 Motion to strike. Defendants' deadline to file their response (Dkt. 66) to plaintiff's motion for contempt (Dkt. 59) is retroactively extended to October 26, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge J Richard Creatura.**3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Christopher Miller, Prisoner ID: 632688)(CMG)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART AND REMANDING IN PART REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 76 Objections to Report and Recommendation, filed by Margaret Gilbert, Daniel Van Ogle, Eric Mainio, Cory Ellis, Wilbur, Miller, S Hudson, Martinez. **4 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Christopher Miller, Prisoner ID: 632688)(TG)
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS by Judge Benjamin H. Settle re 58 Report and Recommendations. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Christopher Miller, Prisoner ID: 632688)(TG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Gilbert et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Gilbert
Represented By: Patricia Campbell Fetterly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Van Ogle
Represented By: Patricia Campbell Fetterly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. McCarty
Represented By: Patricia Campbell Fetterly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?