Barrick v. American Airlines, Inc

Plaintiff: Rebecca Barrick
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc
Case Number: 3:2016cv05957
Filed: November 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Tacoma Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Benjamin H. Settle
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 52 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with prejudice. Clerk directed to close this case. Authorized signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MINUTE ORDER per telephonic notice of settlement, parties are directed to file a notice of settlement within 21 days. Clerk directed to strike the noting date of Defendant's 47 motion for reconsideration. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER directing Plaintiff to file a response to Defendant's 47 MOTION for Reconsideration; Response due 8/28/2017; Reply due 9/1/2017. The Motion 47 is RENOTED for 9/1/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting plaintiff's 33 Motion to amend ; plaintiff to file second amended complaint within 7 days; denying defendant's 35 Motion for Protective Order signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 25 Motion for leave to file an amended complaint; amended complaint due by 6/9/2017. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
March 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Stipulated Scheduling Order as follows: Jury Trial is reset for 2/26/2018 at 09:30 AM before U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/23/2017, Joinder of Parties due by 7/7/2017, Amend ed Pleadings due by 7/7/2017, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 9/4/2017, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 9/28/2017, Discovery Motions due by 9/28/2017, Discovery completed by 10/27/2017, Dispositive motions due by 11/28/2017, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 12/1/2017, Plaintiffs Pretrial Statement due by 1/17/2018, Defendants Pretrial Statement due by 1/29/2018, Motions in Limine due by 2/12/2018, Agreed pretrial order due by 2/16/2018, Voir dire/jury instructions/trial briefs due by 2/20/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (see order for more deadlines) (PM)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Benjamin H. Settle granting 13 MOTION to Reassign Case to the Seattle Division filed by American Airlines, Inc. (TG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrick v. American Airlines, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Barrick
Represented By: John Edward Duke Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Airlines, Inc
Represented By: Caryn Geraghty Jorgensen
Represented By: Brett Thomas MacIntyre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?